Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50682
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2020
Terminated:Jun 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
MDC ENERGY LLC
Represented By
MDC ENERGY LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC TEXAS OPERATOR LLC
Represented By
MDC TEXAS OPERATOR LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC REEVES ENERGY LLC
Represented By
MDC REEVES ENERGY LLC
contact info
Defendant
NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH
Represented By
NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH
contact info
Plaintiff
STEP Energy Services Holdings Ltd
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/27 3:10 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50682 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
7 7 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:42 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
6 6 24 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 2:21 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding directing the procedural consolidation of this adversary proceeding pending under Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS). The docket in Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters concerning this adversary proceeding. Order Signed on 8/7/2020 (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 12:15 PM
ORDER (I) PROCEDURALLY CONSOLIDATINGADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS, AND (II) SETTINGCERTAIN DEADLINES WITH RESPECT THERETO Related [+] Order Signed on 8/7/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 3
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, August 06, 2020
4 4 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Thu 08/06 4:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
3 3 motion Motion to Consolidate Wed 07/22 2:58 PM
Motion to Consolidate Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 03, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 07/03 12:47 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50682 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9858331, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 07/02 9:35 PM
Adversary case 20-50682 Complaint and Request for Declaratory Judgment To Determine Validity, Priority, and Extent of Mineral Liens on the Debtors' Property by STEP Energy Services Holdings Ltd against MDC ENERGY LLC, MDC TEXAS OPERATOR LLC, MDC REEVES ENERGY LLC, NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH. Fee Amount $350 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/30/2020. (Joyce, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit