Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:20-bk-31840
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2020
Terminated:May 09, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Sep 16, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TriVascular Sales LLC
2 Musik
Irvine, CA 92618
Represented By
Thomas R. Califano
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Anh Phuoc Nguyen
Streusand, Landon, Ozburn & Lemmon, LLP
contact info
Brett Ingerman
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Tara Nair
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Rachel Nanes
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Andrew Ball Zollinger
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Adam J. Pie
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Debtor
RMS/Endologix Sideways Merger Corp.
2 Musik
Irvine, CA 92618
Represented By
Thomas R. Califano
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Tara Nair
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Rachel Nanes
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Andrew Ball Zollinger
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Debtor
Nellix, Inc.
2 Musik
Irvine, CA 92618
Represented By
Thomas R. Califano
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Tara Nair
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Rachel Nanes
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Andrew Ball Zollinger
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Debtor
CVD/RMS Acquisition Corp.
2 Musik
Irvine, CA 92618
Represented By
Thomas R. Califano
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Tara Nair
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Rachel Nanes
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Andrew Ball Zollinger
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Debtor
Endologix Canada, LLC
2 Musik
Irvine, CA 92618
Represented By
Thomas R. Califano
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Tara Nair
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Rachel Nanes
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Andrew Ball Zollinger
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Debtor
Endologix, Inc.
2 Musik
Irvine, CA 92618
Represented By
Thomas R. Califano
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Tara Nair
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Rachel Nanes
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Andrew Ball Zollinger
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Debtor
TriVascular Technologies, Inc.
2 Musik
Irvine, CA 92618
Represented By
Thomas R. Califano
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Tara Nair
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Rachel Nanes
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Andrew Ball Zollinger
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Debtor
TriVascular, Inc.
2 Musick
Irvine, CA 92618
Represented By
Thomas R. Califano
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Tara Nair
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Rachel Nanes
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Andrew Ball Zollinger
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 30, 2020 11:11 PM CST
Attorney
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
Represented By
Ryan E. Manns
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Attorney
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
Represented By
Ryan E. Manns
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Attorney
DLA Piper LLP (US)
Claims Agent
Omni Agent Solutions
Creditor
Robert Griffin
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Louis Goldsmith
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
James Hayes
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Michael Lakey
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
David Logan
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Microsoft Corporation and its wholly owned affiliate, Microsoft Licensing, GP
Represented By
Trey Andrew Monsour
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dennis Olson
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
QAD, Inc.
1801 S. Mopac Expressway, Suite 320
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
Beth Stern Fleming
Beth Stern Fleming, LLC
contact info
Sabrina Lynn Streusand
Streusand Landon Ozburn & Lemmon, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Donald Reed
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jan obo Darrell Revette
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Joseph Rodio
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Roberto Salinas
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ron Santoro
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Anita Shetty
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Joyce obo Charles Silversteen
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Raymond Stockton
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dennis Sumner
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Texas Workforce Commission
Kimberly A. Walsh CO Sherri K. Simpson, Paralegal P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
Kimberly A. Walsh
Texas Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Karen Tucker
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
iCIMS, Inc.
Arent Fox LLP c/o Annie Y. Stoops 555 West 5th Street, 48th FL
Los Angeles, CA 90013
Represented By
Annie Y. Stoops
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Creditor
Douglas Flight
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Laurie A. Spindler 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Laurie A. Spindler
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Deerfield ELGX Revolver LLC
Represented By
Paul E. Heath
Vinson & Elkins L.L.P.
contact info
Matthew J. Pyeatt
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Ari B. Blaut
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Kristie Duchesne
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
contact info
James L. Bromley
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Benjamin S. Beller
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Creditor
Alan Collins
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Deerfield Private Design Fund IV, L.P.
Represented By
Paul E. Heath
Vinson & Elkins L.L.P.
contact info
Matthew J. Pyeatt
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Ari B. Blaut
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Kristie Duchesne
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
contact info
James L. Bromley
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Benjamin S. Beller
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Creditor
David Begala
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By
Mark W. Eckard
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Keith Miles Aurzada
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St. 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter Nemer
contact info
Creditor
Andrew Kerr
Represented By
Ira L. Herman
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Rhodes
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Creditor
Fogarty Family Trust
Represented By
Berry D. Spears
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP
contact info
Gabrielle L. Albert
Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP
contact info
Creditor
Carmelo Giaquinta
Represented By
Janet G. Abaray
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine PC
contact info
John C. Leininger
Shapiro Bieging Barber Otteson LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Adam L. Shiff
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Matthew B. Stein
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Ryan E. Manns
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
David S. Rosner
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres LLP
contact info
Howard W. Schub
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres LLP
contact info
Sheron Korpus
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
FTI Consulting, Inc.
Financial Advisor
Ankura Consulting Group, LLC
Represented By
Ryan E. Manns
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Omni Management Group
5955 De Soto Avenue Suite 100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Interested Party
University of Texas System
Bankruptcy & Collections Division P. O. Box 12548 MC-008
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
Jason B. Binford
The Attorney General Of Texas
contact info
Other Professional
Jefferies, LLC
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202
Represented By
Meredyth Kippes
United States Trustee
contact info


1. Endologix files for Ch. 11 bankruptcy, plans to go private (medtechdive.com)
Submitted Tue 07/07/2020
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
692 692 misc Certificate of service Tue 05/24 4:27 PM
Certificate of service re: Final Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 05/09/2022 [Docket No. 691] Filed by Claims Agent Omni Agent Solutions Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 691 Final Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 05/09/2022 filed by Debtor TriVascular Sales LLC. filed by Debtor TriVascular Sales LLC
Monday, May 23, 2022
691 691 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Mon 05/23 6:20 PM
Final Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 05/09/2022 filed by Debtor TriVascular Sales LLC. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
690 690 misc Certificate of service Tue 05/17 3:48 PM
Certificate of service re: Final Decree and Order Closing the Remaining Chapter 11 Case and Terminating Services of Omni Agent Solutions [Docket No. 687] Filed by Claims Agent Omni Agent Solutions Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 687 Final decree and order closing the remaining Chapter 11 case and terminating services of Omni Agent Solutions (Case closed) Pursuant to LBR 9070-1, any exhibits that were admitted by the Court may be claimed and removed from the Clerks Office during the 60-day period following final disposition of a case by the attorney or party who introduced the exhibits. Any exhibit not removed within the 60-day period may be destroyed or otherwise disposed of by the Bankruptcy Clerk. Entered on 5/9/2022