Member Case
Lead case is: 3:20-bk-31840

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:20-bk-31841
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2020
Terminated:Dec 03, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Endologix, Inc.
2 Musik
Irvine, CA 92618
Represented By
Andrew Ball Zollinger
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Monday, February 08, 2021
16 16 claims Withdrawal of claim Mon 02/08 3:26 PM
Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: claim paid in full. 1 Filed by Creditor TEXAS WORKFORCE COMMISSION. (Crawford, Janaha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
15 15 order Final decree Thu 12/03 2:52 PM
Final decree (Case closed) . Entered on 12/3/2020 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
14 14 notice Notice (generic) Tue 08/04 11:41 PM
Notice of Filing of Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methodology, and Disclaimers Regarding the Debtors Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs filed by Debtor Endologix, Inc. Related [+]. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-] 12 Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Endologix, Inc. (RE: related document(s)3 Notice of deficiency).,13 Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Endologix, Inc. (RE: related document(s)3 Notice of deficiency).
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Global Notes
13 13 misc Statement of financial affairs Tue 08/04 11:19 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Endologix, Inc. Related [+]. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
12 12 misc Schedules Tue 08/04 11:19 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Endologix, Inc. Related [+]. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
Friday, July 10, 2020
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Fri 07/10 11:25 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/10/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/13/2020 at 10:00 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 11/12/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 2/9/2021.
10 10 misc Support/supplemental document Fri 07/10 8:01 PM
Support/supplemental document /Amended List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims filed by Debtor Endologix, Inc. Related [+]. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)
9 9 misc Support/supplemental document Fri 07/10 2:54 PM
Support/supplemental document /Verification of Mailing List filed by Debtor Endologix, Inc. Related [+]. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-] 4 Matrix
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
8 8 court BNC certificate of mailing Wed 07/08 11:25 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/08/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B,D,E/F,G,H due 7/20/2020. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 7/20/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/20/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/20/2020. Creditor matrix due 7/8/2020.Statement of Income/Means Test Form due 7/20/2020. (Kerr, S.)
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
7 7 order Joint administration Tue 07/07 4:20 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 3:20-bk-31840 with member case 3:20-bk-31841. An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court forthe Northern District of Texas directing joint administration of the following chapter 11 cases for procedural purposes only: TriVascular Sales LLC, Case. No. 20-31840 (SGJ); Endologix, Inc., Case. No. 20-31841 (SGJ);CVD/RMS Acquisition Corp., Case. No. 20-31842 (SGJ); TriVascular Technologies, Inc., Case. No. 20-31843 (SGJ); RMS/Endologix Sideways Merger Corp., Case. No. 20-31844 (SGJ); Nellix, Inc., Case. No. 20-31845 (SGJ); TriVascular, Inc., Case. No. 20-31846 (SGJ); and Endologix Canada, LLC, Case. No. 20-31847 (SGJ). The docket in Case No. 20-31840 (SGJ) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Related [+] Entered on 7/7/2020. (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-] 2
6 6 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 07/07 1:38 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting coversheet for creditor matrix from attorney for debtor. Related [+] Responses due by 7/9/2020. (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 4 Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor Endologix, Inc. (RE: related document(s)3 Notice of deficiency).
5 5 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Tue 07/07 9:55 AM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/13/2020 at 10:00 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 11/12/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 2/9/2021. (Neary, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
4 4 226 pgs misc Matrix Mon 07/06 2:08 PM
Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor Endologix, Inc. Related [+]. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
3 3 2 pgs court Notice of deficiency Mon 07/06 10:57 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B,D,E/F,G,H due 7/20/2020. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 7/20/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/20/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/20/2020. Creditor matrix due 7/8/2020.Statement of Income/Means Test Form due 7/20/2020. (Kerr, S.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 05, 2020
2 2 10 pgs motion Joint administration Sun 07/05 10:16 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases 20-31840 20-31841 20-31842 20-31843 20-31844 20-31845 20-31846 20-31847 Filed by Debtor Endologix, Inc. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Order
1 1 23 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Sun 07/05 8:39 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Endologix, Inc. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Sun 07/05 8:42 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 20-31841 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 27897559, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1