Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:15-bk-60003

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 6:20-ap-06005
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Royalty Partners, LLC, Defendant
8 The Green, Ste. A
Dover, DE 19901
Represented By
Royalty Partners, LLC
contact info
Defendant
J.W. "BILL" Rhea, IV, Defendant
900 RR 620 South Ste. C101-139
Austin, TX 78734
Represented By
J.W. "BILL" Rhea, IV
contact info
Plaintiff
Rodney Tow, Rodney Tow, Trustee for the Creditor Trust
1122 Highborne Cay Court
Texas City, TX 77590
Represented By
Rodney Tow
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, October 16, 2023
court Case Reassigned-Adversary Mon 10/16 8:36 PM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (RobbieWestmoreland)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 03, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/03 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, July 01, 2021
18 18 order Setting Hearing Thu 07/01 4:32 PM
Agreed Order Granting Permanent Injunction Signed on 7/1/2021 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 7/16/2021 at 09:30 AM by telephone and video conference. (VrianaPortillo)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Temporary Restraining Order
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
17 17 misc Proposed Order Wed 06/30 2:41 PM
Proposed Order RE: Agreed Order Granting Permanent Injuction (Filed By Rodney Tow ) Related [+] (Tow, Rodney)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Temporary Restraining Order
Friday, September 25, 2020
16 16 misc Certificate Fri 09/25 10:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing (Filed By Rodney Tow ) Related [+] (Tow, Rodney)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, September 24, 2020
15 15 motion Default Judgment Thu 09/24 12:46 PM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Rodney Tow (Tow, Rodney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Rodney Tow
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Saturday, July 18, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/18 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Temporary Restraining Order
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
13 13 order Temporary Restraining Order Wed 07/15 10:27 PM
Agreed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Related [+] Signed on 7/15/2020. (emiller)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
12 12 misc Proposed Order Tue 07/14 5:43 PM
Proposed Order RE: Agreed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction (Filed By J.W. "BILL" Rhea IV, Royalty Partners, LLC, Rodney Tow ) Related [+] (Tow, Rodney)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,6 Order Setting Hearing
11 11 misc Witness List Tue 07/14 5:38 PM
Witness List (Filed By Rodney Tow ) Related [+] (Tow, Rodney)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,6 Order Setting Hearing
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Att: 12 Exhibit L
Att: 13 Exhibit M
Friday, July 10, 2020
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 07/10 4:15 PM
Summons Service Executed on J.W. "BILL" Rhea IV 7/10/2020; Royalty Partners, LLC 7/10/2020. (Tow, Rodney)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate Fri 07/10 4:14 PM
Certificate of Mailing (Filed By Rodney Tow ) Related [+] (Tow, Rodney)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,4 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings,5 Summons Issued,6 Order Setting Hearing,7 BNC Certificate of Mailing,8 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thursday, July 09, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/09 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/09/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Setting Hearing
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/09 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/09/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
6 6 order Setting Hearing Tue 07/07 4:44 PM
Order Granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Signed on 7/7/2020 Related [+] A Hearing on a preliminary injunction is scheduled for 7/16/2020 at 09:30 AM at telephone and video conference. (VrianaPortillo)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 07/07 9:12 AM
Summons Issued on J.W. "BILL" Rhea IV Date Issued 7/7/2020; Royalty Partners, LLC Date Issued 7/7/2020. (hler)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Tue 07/07 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order (Adversary) Mon 07/06 10:50 AM
Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Filed by Rodney Tow (Tow, Rodney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Proposed Order
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Mon 07/06 10:43 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on J.W. "Bill" Rhea IV, Royalty Partners, LLC. (Tow, Rodney)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Mon 07/06 10:29 AM
Adversary case 20-06005 Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint by Rodney Tow against Royalty Partners, LLC, J.W. "BILL" Rhea IV. Fee Amount $350 (Tow, Rodney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Index G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
crditcrd none Mon 07/06 3:45 PM
Receipt of Complaint 20-06005 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22251773. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]