Royalty Partners, LLC
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 6:15-bk-60003 |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 10, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 17, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Royalty Partners, LLC
1 Riverway Ste 610
Houston, TX 77056-2044 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Rodney Tow
26219 Oak Ridge Dr.
The Woodlands, TX 77380 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
1. | Eagle Ford firm Royalty Partners files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection in Victoria (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/04/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago |
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned
Mon 10/16 8:35 PM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated (RobbieWestmoreland) |