Mark Caloca v. SJK, Inc. dba Fremont Ford et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-05918 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 4:20-cv-03900 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 28, 2020 2:52 AM PST |
Petitioner
Mark Caloca
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
SJK, Inc. dba Fremont Ford
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, May 13, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 05/13 1:46 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Mon 07/06 8:39 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (esa) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 07/06 8:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa) |
|
15 | 15
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Mon 07/06 8:12 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Mon 07/06 8:23 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 52 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 6/26/20 regarding transfer of Case No. 4:20-cv-03900 JST from Northern California Oakland. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814 AB (FFMx). (esa) |
|
14 | 14 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District Court for the Central District of California. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Alan Cooper Plaintiff Mark Caloca's Notice of Appearance of David Alan Cooper, Esq. (Cooper, David) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
12 | 12 Plaintiff Mark Caloca's Brief Regarding Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding filed byMark Caloca. (Mobasseri, Robert) Modified on 6/25/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Mobasseri (Mobasseri, Robert) Modified on 6/25/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Barbara Ann Rohr. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Notice of Removal). Please upd ate your personal profile on ECF Re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Ford Motor Company (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | ||
Tuesday, June 16, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/16/2020.(anjS, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Monday, June 15, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) | |
7 | 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
6 | 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
Friday, June 12, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hailey Marie Rogerson(Rogerson, Hailey) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG19038710. (). Filed byFord Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/6/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Hailey M. Rogerson, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 19 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 20 Certificate/Proof of Service |