Giuliano v. Classic Design Services, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50684 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Classic Design Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T Giuliano, in his capacity as chapter 7 trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/20/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 11/13 10:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50684 Closed (LCN) |
||
Saturday, October 31, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/01 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/31/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 10/30 3:42 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest
Thu 10/29 9:29 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant Classic Design Services, Inc. Signed on 10/29/2020. (LCN) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Wed 10/28 11:37 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/13 4:13 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 10/09 1:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/08/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
court
VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 10/06 9:54 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Classic Design Services, Inc. Signed on 10/6/2020. (LCN) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Mon 10/05 4:24 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Counsel in Support | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Counsel | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Alias Summons
Tue 07/28 11:04 AM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Classic Design Services, Inc.. Tickle due by: 9/28/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 07/07 2:20 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Classic Design Services, Inc.. Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/07 2:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50684 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9862332, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 07/07 12:37 PM
Adversary case 20-50684 Complaint For Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 by Alfred T Giuliano against Classic Design Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/7/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |