Giuliano v. Doug Mockett & Company, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50685 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Doug Mockett & Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T Giuliano, in his capacity as chapter 7 trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/01 9:18 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50685 Closed (LCN) |
||
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 03/31 11:20 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice related document(s)1 Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/24 3:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
utility
Reopen AP Case
Tue 03/23 11:26 AM
Adversary Case Reopened. (LCN) |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
order
Reopen Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/22 4:16 PM
Order Approving Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding. Order Signed on 3/22/2021. (JMW) |
|
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Adv)
Thu 03/18 4:28 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion to (A) Reopen Doug Mockett & Company, Inc. Adversary Proceeding, (B) Vacate Default Judgment; and (C) Grant Related Relief Reclosing the Adversary Proceeding Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Reopen Adversary Proceeding - Motion
Tue 03/02 8:38 AM
Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding Motion to (A) Reopen Doug Mockett & Company, Inc. Adversary Proceeding, (B) Vacate Default Judgment; and (C) Grant Related Relief Reclosing the Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 11/13 10:05 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50685 Closed (LCN) |
||
Saturday, October 31, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/01 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/31/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 10/30 3:43 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
court
VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest
Thu 10/29 9:33 AM
Default Judgment Against DefendantDoug Mockett & Company, Inc. Signed on 10/29/2020. (LCN) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Wed 10/28 11:39 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/13 4:14 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 10/09 1:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/08/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
court
VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 10/06 9:59 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Doug Mockett & Company, Inc. Signed on 10/6/2020. (LCN) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Mon 10/05 4:26 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Counsel in Support | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Counsel | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 07/07 2:22 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Doug Mockett & Company, Inc.. Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/07 2:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50685 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9862332, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 07/07 12:40 PM
Adversary case 20-50685 Complaint For Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 by Alfred T Giuliano against Doug Mockett & Company, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/7/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |