Giuliano v. Mode Tranportation, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50688 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mode Tranportation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T Giuliano, in his capacity as chapter 7 trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/11 11:35 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50688 Closed (LCN) |
||
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Stipulation of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice related document(s)1 Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Fri 03/05 2:41 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 05/4/2021. (Kurth, Mette) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 02/05/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Mette H. Kurth is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 4/5/2021. Signed on 2/3/2021. (LCN) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Mode Transportation, LLC Mediation due date: 02/2/2021. (Nimeroff, Jami) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 9/3/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant Mode Transportation, LLC . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Mode Tranportation, LLC. Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/07 2:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50688 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9862332, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50688 Complaint For Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 by Alfred T Giuliano against Mode Tranportation, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/7/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |