Giuliano v. PCB Apps L.L.C.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50690 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
PCB Apps L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T Giuliano, in his capacity as chapter 7 trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/20/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, June 04, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 06/04 3:43 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50690 Closed (LCN) |
||
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 06/03 3:54 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice related document(s)1 Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Monday, May 24, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Mon 05/24 8:35 AM
Status Report with Respect to Certain Adversary Matters Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Tue 03/23 9:46 AM
Status Report with Respect to Certain Adversary Matters Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
mediation
Mediator's Certificate of Completion
Tue 03/09 4:02 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 02/16 5:47 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Roland Gary Jone Order Signed on 2/16/2021. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice | ||
20 | 20
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 02/16 11:06 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Roland Gary Jones, Esq . Receipt Number ADEDC-3525, Filed by PCB Apps L.L.C.. (Tobia, James) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate Certification By Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, February 15, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Mon 02/15 11:00 PM
[ENTERED IN ERROR] Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) Modified on 2/16/2021 (BA) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Thu 01/21 3:27 PM
Status Report with Respect to Certain Adversary Matters Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
mediation
Mediation Status Report
Tue 01/19 9:41 AM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Fri 01/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Mon 11/23 9:27 AM
Status Report with Respect to Certain Adversary Matters Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 10/30 3:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/29/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 27, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate)
Tue 10/27 9:51 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Mediation Report due by 12/28/2020. Signed on 10/27/2020. (LCN) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator
Mon 10/26 12:16 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Ian Connor Bifferato, Esq. Between Plaintiff, Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant, PCB Apps L.L.C. . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation
Mon 10/26 12:14 PM
Stipulation to Toll Discovery Until After the Conclusion of Mediation Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant PCB Apps L.L.C. . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Mon 10/05 10:36 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. Hearing scheduled for 10/7/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/25 10:16 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/24 5:08 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 9/24/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 09/23 11:01 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
6 | 6
notice
Pretrial Conference - Notice
Wed 09/23 10:08 AM
Notice of Pretrial Conference Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/06 3:27 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by PCB Apps L.L.C. Mediation due date: 12/4/2020.(Tobia, James) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
4 | 4
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 08/06 3:24 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by PCB Apps L.L.C. (Tobia, James) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 07/07 2:28 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant PCB Apps L.L.C.. Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/07 2:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50690 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9862332, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 07/07 1:00 PM
Adversary case 20-50690 Complaint For Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 by Alfred T Giuliano against PCB Apps L.L.C.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/7/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |