Giuliano v. Yang Ming (America) Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50692 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 11, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Yang Ming (America) Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as chapter 7 trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/20/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 02/11 8:34 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50692 Closed (LCN) |
||
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 02/10 2:30 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice related document(s)1 Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 01/19 4:57 PM
Notice of Settlement Notice of Proposed Settlement of Preference Claim Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/08 4:08 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/08 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 01/07/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
court
VAN-416 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation
Tue 01/05 3:05 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Brett Fallon is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 3/8/2021. Signed on 1/5/2021. (LCN) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 09/02 11:22 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Yang Ming (America) Corporation Mediation due date: 01/4/2021.(Kerrick, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stipulation
Thu 07/30 8:49 PM
Stipulation Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant, Yang Ming (America) Corporation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter J.) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 07/07 2:31 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Yang Ming (America) Corporation. Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/07 2:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50692 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9862332, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 07/07 1:06 PM
Adversary case 20-50692 Complaint For Avoidance And Recovery Of Preferential Transfers Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Yang Ming (America) Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/7/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |