Giuliano v. Marvin J. Perry, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50696 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Marvin J. Perry, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/20/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/09 8:05 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50696 Closed (LCN) |
||
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 04/08 2:07 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice related document(s)1 Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 02/27 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 02/26/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 24, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
court
VAN-416 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation
Wed 02/24 11:35 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Brett Fallon is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 4/26/2021. Signed on 2/24/2021. (LCN) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 10/26 5:59 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Marvin J. Perry, Inc. Mediation due date: 02/23/2021. (Sullivan, William) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/14 2:33 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/13 3:36 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending the Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 10/13/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Mon 10/05 10:25 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/11 3:02 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/10 11:47 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 9/10/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Thu 09/10 9:04 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stipulation
Thu 07/30 9:03 PM
Stipulation Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant, Marvin J. Perry, Inc. for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter J.) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Fri 07/10 1:24 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50696 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9867636, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Thu 07/09 1:26 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Marvin J. Perry, Inc.. [Pretrial Conference Date To Be Determined] Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 07/09 1:21 PM
Adversary case 20-50696 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 & 550 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Marvin J. Perry, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |