California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Victoria S Kaufman
Case #: 1:20-bk-11237
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2020
Terminated:Jul 05, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Oct 12, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
BGS WORKS, INC.
20144 Ruston Rd
Woodland Hills, CA 91364-5638
Represented By
Matthew D. Resnik
Resnik Hayes Moradi
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
271 271 court X - Document (Generic) Wed 02/07 3:20 PM
See attached PDF re: Court's ruling at hearing held 2/7/24 at 1:00 pm Related [+] (JC)
Related: [-] 265 Order to Show Cause (BNC-PDF)
Friday, February 02, 2024
270 270 misc Statement Fri 02/02 11:31 PM
Statement DEBTORS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, WHY PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) AND 112(b), THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE CONVERTED TO ONE UNDER CHAPTER 7 Filed by Debtor BGS WORKS, INC.. (Tang, Kevin)
Related: [-]