Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-11237

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Victoria S Kaufman
Case #: 1:24-ap-01011
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2024
Terminated:Aug 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
BGS WORKS, INC.
20144 Ruston Road
Woodland Hills, CA 91364
Represented By
BGS WORKS, INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
Steve Barnoy
23667 Draco Way
West Hills, CA 91307
Represented By
Craig R Smith
Smith Law Firm
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, August 23, 2024
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/23 1:05 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1011 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (PG)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 03, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 08/03 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, August 01, 2024
15 15 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Thu 08/01 12:03 PM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/1/2024 Related [+]. (LF1)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy
Friday, June 28, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 06/28 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Thursday, June 27, 2024
13 13 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 06/27 2:09 PM
Hearing Continued pursuant to ruling at hearing held on 6/26/24. Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/31/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 301, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Victoria S. Kaufman (PG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 06/27 2:22 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 07/31/2024 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for1 , (PG)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Steve Barnoy
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
12 12 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Wed 06/26 12:38 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) BGS Works, Inc. Related [+] (JC)
Related: [-] 8 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy,11 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy
Friday, June 21, 2024
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Fri 06/21 4:48 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to BGS WORKS, INC. Filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy. (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service
10 10 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 06/21 4:20 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document was not filed on the Court's Mandatory Form. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT MANDATORY FORM. Related [+] (LF1)
Related: [-] 8 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy
9 9 misc Status report Fri 06/21 3:03 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy Related [+]. (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-] 6 Summons Issued
8 8 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Fri 06/21 3:00 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to BGS Works, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy. (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF LAURIE CAREY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/21 2:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on BGS WORKS, INC. 4/25/2024 (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
6 6 court Summons Issued Fri 04/19 3:52 PM
Summons Issued on BGS WORKS, INC. Date Issued 4/19/2024, Answer Due 5/20/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/26/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 301, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Victoria S. Kaufman (JC)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy
5 5 misc Statement Fri 04/19 2:19 PM
Statement ADVERSARY PROCEEDING COVER SHEET Filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy. (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 04/18 2:15 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Filer did not select causes of action at filing. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO COMPLETE AND FILE AN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING COVER SHEET (Form 1040) WITH THE CORRECT CAUSE(S) OF ACTION LISTED. Related [+] (JC)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steve Barnoy
3 3 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required (Miscellaneous Case) Thu 04/18 2:07 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other - Incorrect event code used. A summons will be issued by the clerk's office. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (JC)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Service Unexecuted
2 2 cmp Summons Service Unexecuted Thu 04/18 11:55 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted Re: Steve Barnoy (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/18 11:49 AM
Adversary case 1:24-ap-01011. Complaint by Steve Barnoy against BGS WORKS, INC.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-]