Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-33568

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:20-bk-33588
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2020
Terminated:Dec 10, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Socal Holding, LLC
27200 Tourney Rd Ste 200
Santa Clarita, CA 91355-4910
Represented By
Paul E Heath
Vinson And Elkins
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Saturday, September 18, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/18 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Final Decree
Thursday, December 10, 2020
6 6 order Final Decree (No Form) Thu 09/16 4:56 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 12/10/2020. (ltie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 19, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/19 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order for Joint Administration
Saturday, July 18, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/18 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Thursday, July 16, 2020
3 3 order Joint Administration Thu 07/16 8:23 PM
Order for Joint Administration under 20-33568 Signed on 7/16/2020 (aaloadi)
Related: [-]
order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Thu 07/16 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Thu 07/16 8:24 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-33568 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Wed 07/15 10:25 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Socal Holding, LLC. (Heath, Paul)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 07/15 11:37 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-33588 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22277861. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]