Thums Long Beach Company Jointly Administered under 20-33568.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-33568
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-33568
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:20-bk-33590 |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 10, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50,001-100,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Thums Long Beach Company
27200 Tourney Rd Ste 200
Santa Clarita, CA 91355-4910 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago |
Saturday, September 18, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/18/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 12/10/2020. (ltie) |
|
Sunday, July 19, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/19/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, July 18, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order for Joint Administration under 20-33568 Signed on 7/16/2020 (aaloadi) |
|
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Thu 07/16 6:00 AM
|
||
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Thu 07/16 8:26 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-33568 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) |
||
Wednesday, July 15, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Thums Long Beach Company. (Heath, Paul) |
|
crditcrd
none
Wed 07/15 11:37 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-33590 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22277861. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |