Giuliano v. Nippon Yusen C/O NYK Services (North America) Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50714 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Nippon Yusen C/O NYK Services (North America) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group LLC, et al.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 27, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 04/27 10:46 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50714 Closed (SJS) |
||
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 04/26 11:19 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice related document(s)1 ,7 Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Saturday, April 24, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 04/25 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/24/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 04/22 3:08 PM
Notice of Settlement Notice of Proposed Settlement of Preference Claim Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Keane, Peter) |
|
6 | 6
court
VAN-416 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation
Thu 04/22 1:43 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Erin Brignola is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 6/21/2021. Signed on 4/22/2021. (LCN) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 09/09 11:06 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Nippon Yusen C/O NYK Services (North America) Inc. Mediation due date: 01/7/2021.(Kerrick, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stipulation
Thu 07/30 8:24 PM
Stipulation Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant, Nippon Yusen c/o NYK Services (North America) Inc. for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter J.) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/20 1:16 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50714 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9879580, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Thu 07/16 4:36 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Nippon Yusen C/O NYK Services (North America) Inc.. Tickle due by: 9/14/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 07/16 4:33 PM
Adversary case 20-50714 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 & 550 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Nippon Yusen C/O NYK Services (North America) Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |