Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03096
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2020
Terminated:Nov 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
IntelePeer Holdings, Inc.
2640 Youree Drive, Ste. 100
Shreveport, LA 71104
Represented By
IntelePeer Holdings, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 11/03 10:43 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 10/19 1:47 PM
Stipulation Agreed Stipulation and Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice By Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee and Between IntelePeer Holdings, Inc. filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/19 3:31 PM
Notice of Appearance / Notice of Entry of Appearance and Request for Service filed by Jennifer Maria Kappel of DLA Piper LLP (US) on behalf of IntelePeer Holdings, Inc.. (Kappel, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer None Wed 08/19 3:05 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Jennifer Maria Kappel of DLA Piper LLP (US) on behalf of IntelePeer Holdings, Inc.. (Kappel, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/21 4:09 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee,2 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Monday, July 20, 2020
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Mon 07/20 8:50 AM
Summons and notice issued to IntelePeer Holdings, Inc. Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Friday, July 17, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 07/17 12:08 PM
Adversary case 20-03096 Complaint against IntelePeer Holdings, Inc. (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]