California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 2:20-cv-06414
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2020
Terminated:May 14, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2021 1:13 AM PST
Defendant
Gov. Gavin Newsom
Represented By
Todd Grabarsky
Caag - Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Seth E Goldstein
Caag - Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Harvest International Ministry, Inc.
Represented By
Horatio G. Mihet
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Daniel J Schmid
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Roger K. Gannam
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Nicolaie Cocis
Law Offices Of Nicolai Cocis
contact info
Mathew D Staver
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Harvest Rock Church, Inc.
Represented By
Horatio G. Mihet
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Daniel J Schmid
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Roger K. Gannam
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Nicolaie Cocis
Law Offices Of Nicolai Cocis
contact info
Mathew D Staver
Liberty Counsel
contact info


1. Federal Judge Denies Emergency Order in Pasadena Church Singing Case (pasadenanow.com)
Submitted Tue 07/21/2020
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
96 96 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Thu 05/20 10:57 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,79 filed by Harvest Rock Church, Inc., Harvest International Ministry, Inc. CCA # 20-56357 The joint motion to dismiss the appeal is granted. Dkt. No. 80. The remainingpending motions are denied as moot. Dkt. Nos. 54, 71, 73, 79. This order serves asthe mandate of the court. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
95 95 judgmentCV Permanent Injunction Mon 05/17 12:34 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERING PERMANENT INJUNCTION, AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, AND DISMISSING ACTION filed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs should be and hereby are declared prevailing parties for purposes of 42 U.S.C. § 1988; Defendant shall pay Plaintiffs the sum of $1,350,000 for Plaintiffs reasonable attorneys fees and costs necessarily incurred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961, post-judgment interest shall begin to accrue 60 days from the date this Court signs this Order; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (twdb)
Related: [-]