Original Case: 2:20-cv-06414

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-55907
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2020
Terminated:Dec 03, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Dec 05, 2020 12:27 AM PST
Amicus Curiae
AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, BEND THE ARC: A JEWISH PARTNERSHIP FOR JUSTICE, COVENANT NETWORK OF PRESBYTERIANS, INTERFAITH ALLIANCE FOUNDATION, METHODIST FEDERATION FOR SOCIAL ACTION, NATIONAL COUNCIL OF CHURCHES OF CHRIST IN THE US
Represented By
Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
contact info
Richard B. Katskee
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
contact info
Amicus Curiae - Pending
LEADING EPIDEMIOLOGISTS AND PUBLIC HEALTH EXPERTS
Represented By
Susannah Weaver
Donahue, Goldberg & Weaver, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GAVIN NEWSOM, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of California
Represented By
Todd Grabarsky
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Seth Goldstein
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HARVEST ROCK CHURCH, INC., itself and on behalf of its member churches in California
Represented By
Nicolai Cocis
Law Office of Nicolai Cocis
contact info
Daniel Joseph Schmid
LIBERTY COUNSEL
contact info
Mathew D. Staver
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Roger Gannam
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Horatio Gabriel Mihet
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HARVEST INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY, INC., itself and on behalf of its member churches in California
Represented By
Nicolai Cocis
Law Office of Nicolai Cocis
contact info
Daniel Joseph Schmid
LIBERTY COUNSEL
contact info
Mathew D. Staver
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Roger Gannam
Liberty Counsel
contact info
Horatio Gabriel Mihet
Liberty Counsel
contact info

GPO Oct 01 2020
Filed Order for PUBLICATION (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) (Dissent by Judge O'Scannlain) For these reasons, the emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [11821053-2]) is denied. We grant the motion to file the amicus brief in support of the Governor for purposes of this emergency motion (Docket Entry No. [11824972-2]). [11843942]

Docket last updated: 12/05/2020 12:26 AM PST
Monday, August 31, 2020
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction. C.R. 3-3. [11807434] (RT) [Entered: 08/31/2020 10:19 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Docketing Letter
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 5 22 pgs Case Opening Packet
2 2 2 pgs Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed August 28, 2020 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later September 25, 2020, the answering brief is due October 23, 2020, or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11808401] (AF) [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:05 PM]
Related: [-]