Southeast Alabama Gas District v. Sklar Exploration Company, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01210 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 22, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sklar Exploration Company, LLC
5395 Pearl Parkway Suite 200
Boulder, CO 80301 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sklarco, LLC
5395 Pearl Parkway Suite 200
Boulder, CO 80301 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Southeast Alabama Gas District, Southeast Alabama Gas District, Plaintiff
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 11/22 4:02 PM
Adversary Case Number 20-01210 EEB Closed. (mjb) |
||
Sunday, November 07, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/07 9:16 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/07/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 05, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
order
Dismiss Case
Fri 11/05 9:52 AM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice . (mjb) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 11/05 9:54 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 20-01210 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 11/19/2021 to review for closing. (mjb) |
||
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 11/04 5:03 PM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Case For Other Reasons Settlement Agreement Filed by Keith D. Tooley on behalf of Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc., Sklar Exploration Company, LLC, Southeast Alabama Gas District. (Tooley, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order Granting Joint Motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice | ||
Wednesday, November 25, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 11/25 10:24 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/25/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 11/23 4:52 PM
Copy of Order Approving Global Settlement Agreement to Resolve Adversary Proceedings. . (saa) |
|
Sunday, September 20, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 09/20 10:20 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/20/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/18 12:23 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc. Answer Due 10/2/2020; GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP Answer Due 10/2/2020; Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. Answer Due 10/2/2020; Sklar Exploration Company, LLC Answer Due 10/2/2020; Sklarco, LLC Answer Due 10/2/2020 . (jss) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
4
pgs
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/17 12:08 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Timothy C. Mohan on behalf of Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. . (Mohan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 09/10 10:23 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/10/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/08 10:26 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc. Answer Due 9/18/2020; GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP Answer Due 9/18/2020; Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. Answer Due 9/18/2020; Sklar Exploration Company, LLC Answer Due 9/18/2020; Sklarco, LLC Answer Due 9/18/2020 . (jss) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/03 9:21 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Timothy C. Mohan on behalf of Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. . (Mohan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 08/19 10:26 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/19/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/17 2:32 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc. Answer Due 9/4/2020; GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP Answer Due 9/4/2020; Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. Answer Due 9/4/2020; Sklar Exploration Company, LLC Answer Due 9/4/2020; Sklarco, LLC Answer Due 9/4/2020 . (jss) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/14 3:52 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Timothy C. Mohan on behalf of Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. . (Mohan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 07/30 4:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Casey Carlton Breese on behalf of Southeast Alabama Gas District . (Breese, Casey) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Tue 07/21 1:45 PM
Summons Issued on Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc. Answer Due 08/20/2020; GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP Answer Due 08/20/2020; Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. Answer Due 08/20/2020; Sklar Exploration Company, LLC Answer Due 08/20/2020; Sklarco, LLC Answer Due 08/20/2020; Southeast Alabama Gas District Answer Due 08/20/2020. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Breese, Casey) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 07/20 10:00 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01210 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29093484. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/20 9:57 AM
Adversary case 20-01210 Complaint by Southeast Alabama Gas District against Sklar Exploration Company, LLC, Sklarco, LLC, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc., GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc.. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 11/17/2020 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Breese, Casey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 |