Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03106
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2020
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Light Field Lab, Inc.
Represented By
Light Field Lab, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Paula S. Beran
Tavenner & Beran, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 04/03 4:43 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Dietz, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 04/01 3:32 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
6 6 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 09/17 5:31 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by David N. Tabakin. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/31 2:29 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee,2 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Friday, July 24, 2020
4 4 court Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee Fri 07/24 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 118690. Fee Amount $350.00. (manleyc)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 07/24 1:02 PM
Payment cleared on Complaint 20-03106 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Paid over the counter, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (Gary) Modified on 7/24/2020 (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Fri 07/24 11:39 AM
Summons and notice issued to Light Field Lab, Inc. Related [+] (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, July 23, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 07/23 3:05 PM
Adversary case 20-03106 Complaint against Light Field Lab, Inc. filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]