Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee v. Asian Restaurant International Development and Man
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kevin R Huennekens |
Case #: | 3:20-ap-03108 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Asian Restaurant International Development and Management Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 13, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
court
Adversary Proceeding Closed
Thu 05/13 2:32 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel) |
|
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Default Judgment Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Trustee in the amount of $19,088.00 (the Judgment Amount) plus interest at the statutory rate from entry of this orderuntil paid. (Bullock, Nathaniel) |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 2/25/2021, Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 06/7/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by Thomas McKee.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 03/16/2021. Redaction Request Due By 03/30/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/9/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/7/2021. (Gottlieb, Jason) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
court
Hearing held
Thu 02/25 11:47 AM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED. Appearance(s): Paula Beran for Trustee (Gary, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Hearing filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 2/25/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Beran, Paula) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Motion for Default Judgment filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula) |
|
Friday, November 27, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() BNC certificate of mailing (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Entry of Default against Asian Restaurant International Development and Management Corp. (Bullock, Nathaniel) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Motion for Entry of Default filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Withdrawal of Appearance by David N. Tabakin. (Tabakin, David) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Service filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
court
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee
Fri 07/24 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 118690. Fee Amount $350.00. (manleyc) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Fri 07/24 1:02 PM
Payment cleared on Complaint 20-03108 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Paid over the counter, amount $ 350.00. (Gary) Modified on 7/24/2020 (Gary, Lisa) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons and notice issued to Asian Restaurant International Development and Management Corporation (Smith, Linda) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-03108 Complaint against Asian Restaurant International Development and Management Corporation filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Beran, Paula) |