Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03110
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
TGS Martins, Inc.
Represented By
TGS Martins, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Paula S. Beran
Tavenner & Beran, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, October 19, 2020
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Restrict Public Access to Sensitive Case Information Mon 10/19 9:52 AM
Order Granting Motion to Restrict Public Access to Sensitive Case Information Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
10 10 crditcrd none Wed 10/07 3:22 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Motion to Restrict Public Access to Sensitive Case Information 20-03110 KRH) [motion,mrestric] ( 25.00) filing fee. Receipt number 33035837, amount $ 25.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#9
9 9 motion Restrict Public Access to Sensitive Case Information Wed 10/07 3:20 PM
Defendant's Motion to Restrict Public Access to Sensitive Case Information [Redacted document previously filed Related [+] filed by Roy M. Terry Jr. of Terry Law Firm PLLC on behalf of TGS Martins, Inc.. (Terry, Roy)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Answer to Complaint filed by TGS Martins, Inc.
8 8 answer None Wed 10/07 3:03 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Roy M. Terry Jr. of Terry Law Firm PLLC on behalf of TGS Martins, Inc.. (Terry, Roy)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
7 7 answer None Tue 10/06 4:08 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Roy M. Terry Jr. of Terry Law Firm PLLC on behalf of TGS Martins, Inc.. (Terry, Roy)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, September 17, 2020
6 6 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 09/17 5:31 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by David N. Tabakin. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/31 2:33 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee,2 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Friday, July 24, 2020
4 4 court Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee Fri 07/24 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 118690. Fee Amount $350.00. (manleyc)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 07/24 1:02 PM
Payment cleared on Complaint 20-03110 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Paid over the counter, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (Gary) Modified on 7/24/2020 (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Fri 07/24 12:03 PM
Summons and notice issued to TGS Martins, Inc. Related [+] (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, July 23, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 07/23 3:15 PM
Adversary case 20-03110 Complaint against TGS Martins, Inc. filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]