Giuliano v. Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50770 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 28, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 13, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, et al.
Giuliano Miller & Co., LLC 2301 E. Evesham Road Pavillion 800, Suite 210
Voorhees, NJ 08043 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 10/13 2:12 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50770 Closed (LCN) |
||
Monday, October 12, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Dismissal // Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 9/9/2020. (JMW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Deadline for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/28 11:25 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50770 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9892011, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Between Alfred T. Giuliano and Defendant Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Keane, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. Tickle due by: 9/28/2020. (Keane, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50770 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to Sections 502(d), 547 & 550 and Objection to Claim No. 541 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |