Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:20-bk-33948
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Jun 25, 2021

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fieldwood Energy LLC
2000 W Sam Houston Pkwy S Ste 1200
Houston, TX 77042-3623
Represented By
Alfredo R Perez
Weil Gotshal Et Al
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002

GPO Oct 15 2021
COPY OF Memorandum Opinion in 4:20-ap-3476, Signed on 10/15/2021 (TylerLaws)
GPO Oct 15 2021
COPY OF Order in 4:20-ap-3476, Signed on 10/15/2021 (TylerLaws)
GPO Dec 10 2021
COPY OF Memorandum Opinion in 4:20-ap-3497, Signed on 12/10/2021 (TylerLaws)
GPO Feb 08 2022
Memorandum Opinion, Signed on 2/8/2022 (Related document(s):2199 Emergency Motion, 2278 Objection) (TylerLaws) Modified on 2/8/2022 (TylerLaws).
GPO Feb 23 2022
COPY OF Memorandum Opinion in 4:20-ap-3476, Signed on 2/23/2022 (TylerLaws)
GPO Mar 07 2023
Memorandum Opinion and Order of District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. The Court AFFIRMS the Bankruptcy Courts judgment. Signed on 3/7/2023. (btho)
GPO May 16 2023
COPY OF Memorandum Opinion in 4:22-ap-3251, Signed on 5/16/2023 (TylerLaws)
GPO May 16 2023
COPY OF Order in 4:22-ap-3251, Signed on 5/16/2023 (TylerLaws)

1. Fieldwood Energy LLC Commences Voluntary Chapter 11 Process (finance.yahoo.com)
Submitted Wed 08/05/2020
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
3388 3388 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/25 4:17 PM
Agreed Order: (I) (A) Dismissing All Claims and Counterclaims with Prejudice, (B) Directing the Clerk to Close This Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Granting Related Relief, Related [+] Signed on 2/25/2025. (acj4)
Related: [-] 213
Sunday, February 23, 2025
3387 3387 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/23 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 28. Notice Date 02/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3385 Generic Order
Saturday, February 22, 2025
3386 3386 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/22 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 28. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3383 Generic Order
Friday, February 21, 2025
3385 3385 order Generic Order Fri 02/21 12:19 PM
Copy of Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Entry of an Order Dismissal all Appeals and Granting Related relief filed in 4:24-cv-3773. Signed on 2/21/2025 (knp4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
3383 3383 order Generic Order Wed 02/19 6:13 PM
Stipulation and Agreed Order by and Between the Plan Administrator and Philidelphia Indemnity Insurance Company Resolving Claim, Signed on 2/19/2025 Related [+] (acj4)
Related: [-] 2859 Objection to Claim
3382 3382 misc Agenda Wed 02/19 10:50 AM
Agenda for Hearing on 2/20/2025 (Filed By David M. Dunn, as Plan Administrator ). (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]