Fieldwood Energy III LLC v. Genesis Offshore Holdings, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-33948
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-33948
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:22-ap-03249 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Genesis Offshore Holdings, LLC
919 Milam Suite 2100
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fieldwood Energy III LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:11 PM CDT |
Sunday, August 21, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Sun 08/21 5:41 PM
Voluntary Dismissal Under Rule 41. Adversary Case 4:22-ap-3249 Closed. (LinhthuDo) |
||
Wednesday, August 17, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Fieldwood Energy III LLC(Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Summons Service Executed on Genesis Offshore Holdings, LLC 8/10/2022. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Summons Issued on Genesis Offshore Holdings, LLC Date Issued 8/10/2022. (hler) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Request for Issuance of Summons on Genesis Offshore Holdings, LLC. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service (Filed By Fieldwood Energy III LLC ) (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Saturday, August 06, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/06/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/30/2023 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 22-03249 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Fieldwood Energy III LLC against Genesis Offshore Holdings, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |