District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Beryl A Howell
Case #: 1:20-cv-02127
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2020
Terminated:Mar 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 31, 2021 5:06 AM EST
Defendant
WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By
Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHERINE J. MERA
Represented By
David H. Shapiro
Swick & Shapiro, P.C.
contact info

GPO Mar 25 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding defendant's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 25, 2024. (lcbah1)

Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 06, 2024
40 40 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 05/06 2:39 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re39 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (mg)
Related: [-]
39 39 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Mon 05/06 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,35 Memorandum & Opinion by KATHERINE J. MERA. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ADCDC-10875953. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified.(Swick, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion
notice Notice of Error Mon 05/06 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding38 Notice (Other),. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect event. Please refile with the Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit event found under Appeal Documents. (mg)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Mon 05/06 3:08 PM
USCA Case Number 24-5125 for39 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by KATHERINE J. MERA. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/03 3:06 PM
NOTICE Of Appeal by KATHERINE J. MERA re35 Memorandum & Opinion,34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment(Swick, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion
Thursday, April 25, 2024
37 37 misc Bill of Costs Taxed Thu 04/25 1:33 PM
BILL OF COSTS AS TAXED by the Clerk in favor of Defendant in the amount of $5,707.25 against Plaintiff Katherine Mera (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
order .Order Wed 04/24 4:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) Defendant's36 Bill of Costs was filed on April 9, 2024. Fourteen days have passed and plaintiff has filed no objection. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to tax the costs specified in defendant's36 Bill of Costs. See LCvR 54.1(b) ("A party from whom costs are sought may file an opposition to the bill of costs within 14 days after service of the bill.... If no objection is filed, the Clerk shall tax those costs specified in the bill which are permitted by paragraph (d) of this Rule."). Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 24, 2024. (lcbah1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
36 36 misc Bill of Costs Tue 04/09 12:43 PM
BILL OF COSTS by WILLIAM P. BARR. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 4/23/2024.(Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Itemization and Documentation of Costs
Monday, March 25, 2024
35 35 45 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 03/25 11:30 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding defendant's27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 25, 2024. (lcbah1)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 03/25 11:27 AM
ORDER GRANTING defendant's27 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for further details. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 25, 2024. (lcbah1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
33 33 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 03/07 11:25 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WILLIAM P. BARR. (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/03 7:58 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's reply in support of its27 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/7/2023. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Thu 03/02 6:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the government's32 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and DIRECTING the government to file any reply in support of its27 Motion for Summary Judgment by March 7, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 2, 2023. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
32 32 motion Extension of Time to Wed 03/01 4:15 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by WILLIAM P. BARR. (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/26 7:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply in support of27 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/3/2023. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Wed 01/25 8:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the government's31 Motion for Extension of Time, and DIRECTING the government to file any reply in support of its27 Motion for Summary Judgment by March 3, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 25, 2023. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
31 31 motion Extension of Time to Tue 01/24 7:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply by WILLIAM P. BARR. (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
30 30 respm Response to motion Tue 01/03 6:52 PM
RESPONSE re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Opposition filed by KATHERINE J. MERA.(Shapiro, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Exhibit,
Att: 23 Exhibit,
Att: 24 Exhibit,
Att: 25 Exhibit,
Att: 26 Exhibit,
Att: 27 Exhibit,
Att: 28 Exhibit,
Att: 29 Exhibit
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/28 9:24 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to motion for summary judgment due by 1/3/2023; defendant's reply due by 1/31/2023. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Tue 12/27 5:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's29 Consent Motion to Revise Scheduling Order, and DIRECTING plaintiff to file any response to defendant's motion for summary judgment by January 3, 2023, and defendant to file any reply in support of its27 motion for summary judgment by January 31, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 27, 2022. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
notice Notice of QC Fri 12/23 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re29 Motion for Scheduling Order; emailed to rlswick@swickandshapiro.com, cc'd 8 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document , 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. Attorney signature must match ECF login/password for all future fillings. (zed, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
29 29 motion Scheduling Order Thu 12/22 3:49 PM
MOTION for Scheduling Order Revision by KATHERINE J. MERA.(Swick, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 31, 2022
28 28 misc Sealed Document Mon 10/31 8:25 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by WILLIAM P. BARR re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Summary Judgment Mon 10/31 8:22 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by WILLIAM P. BARR.(Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Facts,
Att: 3 Appendix of Exhibits (Vol. I),
Att: 4 Appendix of Exhibits (Vol. II),
Att: 5 Appendix of Exhibits (Vol. III),
Att: 6 Appendix of Exhibits (Vol. IV),
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 10/18 8:25 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary judgment motion due by 10/31/2022; cross-motion and opposition to summary judgment motion due by 1/2/2023; opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to summary judgment motion due by 1/30/2023; reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 3/3/2023.(ztg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 10/17 4:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the government's26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment and for Leave to File Under Seal and AMENDING the SCHEDULING ORDER previously entered on September 28, 2022, as follows: (1) by October 31, 2022, defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment; (2) by January 2, 2023, plaintiff shall file her response to defendant's motion for summary judgment and any cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) by January 30, 2023, defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and any response to plaintiff's cross-motion; and (4) by March 3, 2023, plaintiff shall file any reply in support of her cross-motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 17, 2022. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Leave to File Document Thu 10/13 5:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment , Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by WILLIAM P. BARR. (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/29 8:44 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 10/17/2022; cross-motion and opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 12/19/2022; opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 1/16/2023; reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 2/17/2023. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Wed 09/28 6:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's25 Motion for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment, and amending the scheduling order to govern the proceedings in this case as follows: (1) by October 17, 2022, defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment; (2) by December 19, 2022, plaintiff shall file her response to defendant's motion for summary judgment and any cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) by January 16, 2023, defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and any response to plaintiff's cross-motion; and (4) by February 17, 2023, plaintiff shall file any reply in support of her cross-motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 28, 2022. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Tue 09/27 6:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment by WILLIAM P. BARR. (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
order .Order Mon 08/01 11:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER ISSUING, in light of the parties'23 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to govern proceedings in this case: (1) by October 3, 2022, defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment; (2) by December 5, 2022, plaintiff shall file her response to defendant's motion for summary judgment and any cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) by January 2, 2023, defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and any response to plaintiff's cross-motion; and (4) by February 3, 2023, plaintiff shall file any reply in support of her cross-motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 1, 2022. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 08/01 3:21 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary judgment motion due by 10/3/2022; cross-motion and response to motion for summary judgment due by 12/5/2022; response to cross-motion and reply in support of motion for summary judgment due by 1/2/2023; reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment due by 2/3/2023. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 31, 2022
24 24 misc Transcript Sun 07/31 10:26 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell, held on 6 17-2022 Page Numbers: 1 - 29. Date of Issuance: 7 31-2022 Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth, Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2022.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
23 23 misc Status Report Thu 07/28 4:46 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by WILLIAM P. BARR. (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 07/28 8:20 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2022. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
order .Order Wed 07/27 9:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties jointly to file, as soon as practicable but in no event later than August 15, 2022, a status report advising the Court as to whether discovery has been completed, and in any event, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 27, 2022. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 07/26 12:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART plaintiff's19 Motion for Reconsideration and for a Protective Order ("Pl.'s Mot."); DENYING plaintiff's request to reconsider the Court's18 Order issued June 21, 2022; ISSUING a PROTECTIVE ORDER relieving plaintiff of the obligation to answer the interrogatories numbered 20, 21, and 23 in defendant's [20-1] Second Set of Interrogatories, and further relieving plaintiff of the obligation to respond to plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents; and DIRECTING plaintiff to furnish defendant with answers to interrogatories numbered 17, 18, 19, and 22, the following question in lieu of questions 20 and 21: "State the total amount that you have paid your attorney(s) in connection with this court action and the associated EEO complaint," and the following question in lieu of question 23: "Describe the type of work you have done for your attorney(s), not including work in support of your own case." During a contentious discovery dispute hearing held by teleconference on June 17, 2022, the parties squabbled about, inter alia , whether plaintiff may be compelled to respond to certain questions concerning her attorney's fees arrangements with counsel, which questions plaintiff refused to answer in deposition on the basis of privilege. After ruling on various matters orally and indicating a more detailed order would follow, the Court subsequently issued, on June 21, 2022, the 18 Order. Prior to issuance of the detailed 18 Order, almost immediately after the hearing, defendant proceeded to serve its [20-1] Second Set of Interrogatories and Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents ("Subject Request"). Defendant's Subject Request exceeded what the Court intended to authorize at the hearing, as memorialized in the subsequent 18 Order. Plaintiff, in turn, filed the instant Motion purportedly challenging the Order, where the principal issue (that neither party has addressed despite full briefing) is in the failure of the Subject Request to conform to the Order. As an initial matter, the Order by its plain terms does not authorize defendant to issue a third set of document requests. Rather, it directed plaintiff to respond to defendant's second set of document requests, noting that the second set of requests "seeks only materials that would already be responsive to the first document request," for which plaintiff has a continuing duty to supplement. Order at 4 (emphasis added). While the Order also allowed defendant to propound certain new interrogatories , that authorization did not extend to further document requests. Accordingly, plaintiff is relieved of any duty to respond to the Third Set of Document Requests. This relief alone should extinguish the bulk of plaintiff's vigorous objections raised in the instant motion. The bulk of the parties' briefing on the instant motion relitigates the substantive question whether information concerning fee arrangements is relevant, and therefore discoverable, at a point in the litigation where plaintiff has not yet been deemed a prevailing party. As the Order recognizes, see Order at 34, there is some room for debate on that point, but no need to resolve that debate here given that the minimally burdensome questions on this topic posed at the deposition should have been answered at the deposition, with any relevance objection lodged then. The Order only directed plaintiff to respond to interrogatories corresponding to "these questions about attorney's fees," id. at 4, where "these questions" are five specific questions plaintiff refused to answer at deposition: (1) "What are Mr. Shapiro's fee arrangements with you?"; (2) "Does Mr. Shapiro represent you on contingency, or do you pay him a rate?"; (3) "When was the last time Mr. Shapiro invoiced you for his services and you paid?"; (4) "How much have you paid Mr. Shapiro since you filed your most recent EEO complaint?"; and (5) "Do you perform work for Mr. Shapiro in exchange for legal services?" Def.'s Statement at 6. The interrogatories defendant has actually issued are generally consistent with, but exceed the scope of, the five enumerated questions. The substitutes ordered above for questions 20, 21, and 23 correct that disparity. The interrogatories, as modified, reflect what could have been elicited in a relatively brief exchange had plaintiff not refused to answer them based on supposed privilege objections, when the posed questions elicited no privileged information, and to the extent the privilege objections were a stand-in for relevance concerns, such concerns would not preclude plaintiff from answering. The Court finds that requiring plaintiff to answer these limited questions, while not being required to respond to still more document requests or sit for a follow-up deposition, is the best available option efficiently to place the parties in roughly the positions they would occupy now were it not for the improperly asserted privilege objections at deposition. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 26, 2022. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
22 22 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 07/01 11:58 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re19 MOTION for Reconsideration re18 Order, MOTION for Protective Order filed by KATHERINE J. MERA. (Shapiro, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
21 21 respm Response to motion Wed 06/29 9:03 PM
RESPONSE re19 MOTION for Reconsideration re18 Order, MOTION for Protective Order filed by WILLIAM P. BARR. (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/29 9:08 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to plaintiff's19 Motion for Reconsideration and for a Protective Order due by 6/30/2022; plaintiff's reply due by 7/1/2022. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
20 20 motion Reconsideration Tue 06/28 4:40 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration Memorandum In Support by KATHERINE J. MERA.(Shapiro, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
19 19 motion Reconsideration Protective Order Tue 06/28 4:34 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re18 Order, , MOTION for Protective Order by KATHERINE J. MERA.(Shapiro, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Tue 06/28 6:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING defendant to file, by June 30, 2022 at noon, any response to plaintiff's19 Motion for Reconsideration and for a Protective Order and accompanying20 Memorandum; and DIRECTING plaintiff to file any reply in support of her motion by July 1, 2022 at noon. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 28, 2022. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/22 8:50 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Close of discovery extended to 7/15/2022. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
18 18 order .Order Tue 06/21 5:30 PM
ORDER regarding the parties' discovery dispute, as discussed at the teleconference hearing held June 17, 2022. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 21, 2022. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Joint Email to the Court,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Description of Issues,
Att: 3 Defendant's Statement,
Att: 4 Defendant's Declaration,
Att: 5 Plaintiff's Additional Considerations
Friday, June 17, 2022
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 06/17 2:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell: Telephone Conference held on 6/17/2022. Order to be issued by the Court. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Saint-Loth.) (ztg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 06/14 8:55 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference RESCHEDULED for 6/17/2022, at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Mon 06/13 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: The parties shall take notice that a Telephone Conference is scheduled for June 16, 2022, at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. Connection details will be provided by the deputy clerk. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 05/13 9:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's17 Consent Motion for Extension of Discovery; EXTENDING the close of discovery through June 15, 2022; and DIRECTING the parties to file jointly, by June 15, 2022, a status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 13, 2022. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 05/13 10:47 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2022. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
17 17 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 05/12 1:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by WILLIAM P. BARR. (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
order .Order Tue 01/25 5:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, in light of the parties'16 Joint Status Report, the close of discovery through May 16, 2022; DIRECTING the parties to file jointly, by May 16, 2022, a status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings; and NOTIFYING the parties that if it remains infeasible to safely perform in-person depositions at that time, it will likely be necessary to proceed with depositions by video so as to not prolong this litigation indefinitely. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 25, 2022. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/25 5:05 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/16/2022. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 01/24 5:44 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by WILLIAM P. BARR. (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 24, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 12/24 6:10 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Bradley Silverman on behalf of WILLIAM P. BARR Substituting for attorney Thomas Duffey (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 12/10 10:59 AM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Thomas Duffey on behalf of WILLIAM P. BARR Substituting for attorney Joseph F. Carilli, Jr. (Duffey, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 10/04 9:03 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures due by 12/15/2021; Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure due by 1/15/2022; discovery due by 2/15/2022; Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2022 (ztg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
order .Order Fri 10/01 5:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, in light of the parties'13 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER that supersedes all previous scheduling orders in this matter: (1) on October 25, 2021, the stay of discovery issued by minute order on April 2, 2021, shall be lifted and the parties shall resume discovery; (2) by December 15, 2021, plaintiff shall serve any expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2); (3) by January 15, 2022, defendant shall serve any expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2); and by February 15, 2022, discovery shall close and the parties shall file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 1, 2021. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
13 13 misc Status Report Thu 09/30 5:29 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by WILLIAM P. BARR.(Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, July 02, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 07/02 8:28 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2021. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
12 12 misc Status Report Thu 07/01 4:05 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by WILLIAM P. BARR.(Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Thu 07/01 5:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to submit, by September 30, 2021, a joint status report including a joint recommendation on whether continuation of the stay is appropriate and proposing a schedule for the conclusion of discovery in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 1, 2021. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
11 11 misc Status Report Wed 06/02 11:28 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by WILLIAM P. BARR. (Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to Wed 06/02 11:25 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by WILLIAM P. BARR.(Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Wed 06/02 5:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties'10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 2, 2021. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/02 5:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties'9 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and DIRECTING the parties to file, by June 1, 2021 and every thirty days thereafter, a joint status report including a joint recommendation on whether continuation of the stay is appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 2, 2021. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/02 6:02 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2021, and every thirty days thereafter. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
9 9 motion Stay Thu 04/01 4:27 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay re Order,,,, by WILLIAM P. BARR.(Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 10/27 10:07 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended pleadings/joinder of parties due by 11/15/2020; initial disclosures due by 11/25/2020; plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Statement due by 2/24/2021; defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Statement due by 3/24/2021; discovery due by 4/23/2021; joint status report due by 4/23/2021; dispositive motions due by 6/22/2021; oppositions to dispositive motions due by 8/6/2021; replies due by 8/21/2021. (ztg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
order .Order Mon 10/26 4:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties'8 Joint Report Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of proceedings in this matter: (1) by November 15, 2020, the parties shall file any amended pleadings and join any additional parties; (2) by November 25, 2020, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1); (3) by February 24, 2021, plaintiff shall serve any expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2); (4) by March 24, 2021, defendant shall file any expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2); (5) on April 23, 2021, discovery shall close, and the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court whether (a) the parties request referral for mediation or settlement, (b) the parties request a date for a pretrial conference, or (c) dispositive motions are anticipated; (6) by June 22, 2021, the parties shall file any dispositive motions; (7) by August 6, 2021, the parties shall file any oppositions; and (8) by August 21, 2021, the parties shall file any replies. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 26, 2020. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
8 8 respm Response to Order of the Court Fri 10/23 5:31 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re4 Order filed by KATHERINE J. MERA.(Shapiro, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 09, 2020
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/09 6:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by WILLIAM P. BARR.(Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/25 5:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Fri 08/14 11:54 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM P. BARR served on 8/13/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/10/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/9/2020.)(Shapiro, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit return receipt,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service to US Attorney,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Thursday, August 06, 2020
4 4 order .Order Thu 08/06 1:31 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 6, 2020. (lcbah3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 08/05 3:01 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Errata Wed 08/05 2:20 PM
ERRATA Complaint by KATHERINE J MERA. (Shapiro, David)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/05 2:57 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED) Request for Summons to Issue Tue 08/04 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7422303), CIVIL COVER SHEET by KATHERINE J MERA, REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by KATHERINE J MERA.(Shapiro, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons