Original Case: 1:20-cv-02127

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvus-05125
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:May 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 4:16 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Katherine J. Mera
Represented By
Richard L. Swick
Swick & Shapiro, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2024 4:16 AM EDT
Monday, May 06, 2024
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 24-5125
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2053045] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-02127-BAH filed by Katherine J. Mera. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5125 24-5125
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2053048] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/05/2024. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/05/2024. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/05/2024. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/05/2024. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/05/2024. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 06/05/2024. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/05/2024. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/05/2024. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/20/2024. APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/05/2024. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/05/2024. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/05/2024. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/20/2024 24-5125
Related: [-]