New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 1:11-bk-10859
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2011
Terminated:Apr 22, 2011

Debtor
MK Network, LLC
2080 Silas Deane Hwy
Rocky Hill, CT 06067-2334
Represented By
Samuel Jason Teele
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Friday, April 22, 2011
Case Closed. (Chou, Rosalyn).
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 16, 2011
32 32 Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] . Service Date 04/16/2011. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #31 )
Thursday, April 14, 2011
31 31 Notice dismissing case (Chou, Rosalyn).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2011
30 30 Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Papers filed by Gerard Sylvester Catalanello on behalf of BCC Meridian LP. (Catalanello, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2011
29 29 Certificate of Service of Lisa Marie Bonito re: service ofAgreed Order Dismissing the Debtors' Cases Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 28
Monday, March 28, 2011
28 28 Agreed Order Dismissing The Debtors' Cases Signed On 3/28/2011. This Order is also Directing the Procedural Consolidation and Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of the MK Network Debtors. (Ebanks, Liza) Modified on 5/6/2011 (Richards, Beverly).
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2011
27 27 Certificate of Service of Lisa Marie Bonito Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 26
26 26 Notice of Presentment of Agreed Order Dismissing the Debtors' Cases filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. with presentment to be held on 3/28/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 3/25/2011, (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2011
25 25 Certificate of Service of Lisa Marie Bonito Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 24
24 24 Notice of Proposed Order Agreed Order Dismissing the Debtors' Cases filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2011
23 23 Notice of Hearing previously scheduled for March 9, 2010 at 3:30 p.m. have been rescheduled to March 9, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/9/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 7 ,3
Monday, March 07, 2011
22 22 Certificate of Service of Lisa Marie Bonito Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 19 ,7 ,13 ,12 ,15 ,4 ,3 ,8 ,18 ,17 ,16 ,5 ,6 ,14
Friday, March 04, 2011
21 21 Statement List of Equity Security Holders and Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, March 03, 2011
20 20 Order Signed On 3/3/2011, Granting Application For Pro Hac Vice Re: Sharon L. Levine Related [+] . (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 10
19 19 Notice of Hearing re: Debtors Motion for an Order Pursuant to Section 521 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007(A) (i) Granting the Debtors an Extension of Time to File Their List of Creditors and (ii) Authorizing Debtors to Mail and Serve Initial Notices Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/25/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 3/18/2011, (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 18
18 18 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information to File Their List of Creditors and (ii) Authorizing Debtors to Mail and Serve Initial Notices filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/25/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 3/18/2011, (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed Order
17 17 Notice of Hearing on Debtors Motion For an Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 521 and Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007(C) Extending Time To File Schedules of Assets And Liabilities, Statements of Financial Affairs, and Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/25/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 3/18/2011, (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/25/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 3/18/2011, (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed Order
15 15 Interim Order Signed On 3/3/2011 (I)Authorizing The Debtors To (A) Continue And Maintain Their Existing Cash Management System, (B) Continue And Maintain Their Existing Bank Accounts, And (C) Use Existing Business Forms; And (II)Granting Related Relief. Related [+] Signed On 3/3/2011. (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, March 02, 2011
14 14 Interim Order Signed On 3/2/2011, (A)Authorizing The Debtor To Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, And Honor Certain Employee Benefits, (B) Directing All Banks To Honor Pre-Petition Checks For Payment Of PrePetition Employee Obligations And (C) Authorizing The Debtor To Honor Workers' Compensation Obligations Related [+] . (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 5
13 13 Agreed Interim Order Signed On 3/2/2011, Approving The Use Of Cash COllateral, Providing Adequate Protection And Setting A Final Hearing. Related [+] . (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 7
12 12 Statement Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit C To Debtors Motion Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(A) And 366 For Entry Of Interim And Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Discontinuing, Altering Or Refusing Service On Account Of Prepetition Invoices, (Ii) Deeming Utility Companies To Have Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment And (Iii) Establishing Procedures For Resolving Requests For Additional Assurance Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Revised Exhibit C
Tuesday, March 01, 2011
11 11 Statement AMENDED LIST OF CREDITORS HOLDING 20 LARGEST UNSECURED CLAIMS (CONSOLIDATED) Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 2
10 10 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sharon L. Levine filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
9 9 Notice of Hearing on First Day Motions Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/1/2011 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 7 ,4 ,3 ,5 ,6
8 8 Affidavit Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-2 and in Support of the Debtors' Petitions and First Day Motions filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
7 7 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Interim Order
6 6 Motion to Approve Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) and 366 For Entry of Interim and Final Orders (i) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Discontinuing, Altering or Refusing Service On Account of Prepetition Invoices, (ii) Deeming Utility Companies to Have Adequate Assurance of Future Payment and (iii) Establishing Procedures For Resolving Requests For Additional Assurance filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
5 5 Motion to Authorize The Debtors To Pay Prepetition Wages And Salaries And Related Taxes and (ii) Directing All Banks To Honor Checks For Payment Of Prepetition Employee Obligations filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed form of Order
4 4 Motion to Authorize The Debtors to (a) Continue and Maintain Their Existing Cash Management System, (b) Continue and Maintain Their Existing Bank Accounts, and (c) Use Existing Business Forms; (ii) Granting A Waiver Of Section 345 Investment Guidelines; and (iii) Granting Related Relief filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed form of Order
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-10859 [misc,824] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7455495. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A due 3/14/2011. Schedule B due 3/14/2011. Schedule D due 3/14/2011. Schedule E due 3/14/2011. Schedule F due 3/14/2011. Schedule G due 3/14/2011. Schedule H due 3/14/2011. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 3/14/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/14/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 3/14/2011, (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 11-10859 shl) [motion,122] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7457619. Fee amount 25.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2011
3 3 9 pgs Motion for Joint Administration filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed form of Order
2 2 Statement LIST OF CREDITORS HOLDING 20 LARGEST UNSECURED CLAIMS (CONSOLIDATED) Related [+] filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 3/14/2011. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/14/2011. Corporate Ownership Statement Due At Time Of Filing. Incomplete Filings due by 3/14/2011, Chapter 11 Plan due by 6/28/2011, Disclosure Statement due by 6/28/2011, Initial Case Conference due by 3/30/2011, Filed by Samuel Jason Teele of Lowenstein Sandler, P.C. on behalf of MK Network, LLC. (Teele, Samuel) Modified on 3/1/2011 (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]