Member Case
Lead case is: 1:11-bk-10859

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 1:11-bk-10879
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2011
Terminated:Feb 17, 2012

Debtor
Avalon Programs, LLC
550 Main St Ste 230
Saint Paul, MN 55112-3274
Represented By
Samuel Jason Teele
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 03/10/2013 8:37 PM EDT
Monday, February 28, 2011
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Due At Time Of Filing. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/14/2011. Corporate Ownership Statement Due At Time Of Filing. Incomplete Filings due by 3/14/2011, Chapter 11 Plan due by 6/28/2011, Disclosure Statement due by 6/28/2011, Initial Case Conference due by 3/30/2011, Appointment of patient care ombudsman due by 03/30/2011 Filed by Samuel Jason Teele of Lowenstein Sandler, P.C. on behalf of Avalon Programs, LLC. (Teele, Samuel) Modified on 3/1/2011 (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of Avalon Programs, LLC. (Teele, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed form of Order