Iowa Northern District Court
Case #: 3:14-cr-03024
Case Filed:May 21, 2014
Terminated:Apr 15, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2016 12:49 PM CDT
Interested Party
USPO Daren Schumaker
Interested Party
US Probation
Represented By
uspNotify
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lisa K Hsiao
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Christopher E Parisi
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Peter E Deegan, Jr
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Martin J McLaughlin
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Austin DeCoster (2)
Terminated: 04/15/2015
Represented By
Thomas C Green
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
Frank R Volpe
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info
Mark D Hopson
Sidley Austin, LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 03 2014
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Accept Guilty Plea to Count Three of the Information as to Peter DeCoster. Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 6/3/2014. (des)
GPO Jun 03 2014
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Accept Guilty Plea to Counts One, Two, and Three of the Information as to Quality Egg LLC. Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 6/3/2014. (des)
GPO Jun 03 2014
ORDER Accepting Report and Recommendation re Plea regarding Defendant Peter DeCoster for 20 Report and Recommendation to Accept Guilty Plea to count 3 of the Information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/03/2014. (src)
GPO Jun 03 2014
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Accept Guilty Plea to Count Three of the Information as to Austin DeCoster. Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 6/3/2014. (des)
GPO Jun 03 2014
ORDER Accepting Report and Recommendation re Plea as to Defendant Quality Egg LLC for 25 Report and Recommendation to Accept Guilty Plea to Counts 1, 2, and 3 of the Information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/3/2014. (des)
GPO Jun 03 2014
ORDER Accepting Report and Recommendation re Plea as to Defendant Austin DeCoster for 30 Report and Recommendation to Accept Guilty Plea to Count 3 of the Information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/3/2014. (des)
GPO Apr 14 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 64 Motion That a Sentence of Incarceration is Unconstitutional as to Austin DeCoster (2); denying 71 Motion that a Sentence of Incarceration is Unconstitutional as to Peter DeCoster (3) See text of Memorandum Opinion and Order for further information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 4/14/2015. (Gill, Jennifer) Modified on 4/15/2015 to update text. (src)MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 64 Motion That a Sentence of Incarceration is Unconstitutional as to Austin DeCoster (2); denying 71 Motion that a Sentence of Incarceration is Unconstitutional as to Peter DeCoster (3) See text of Memorandum Opinion and Order for further information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 4/14/2015. (Gill, Jennifer) Modified on 4/15/2015 to update text. (src)
GPO Apr 15 2015
JUDGMENT as to Defendant Peter DeCoster (3), Count 3, Defendant committed to BOP for 3 months on Count 3 of the Information. Supervised release for 1 year. Assessment of $25.00 (paid). Fine of $100,000.00. (paid). Restitution of $83,008.19. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 04/15/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Opinion) (src)
GPO Apr 15 2015
JUDGMENT as to Defendant Quality Egg, LLC (1), Count(s) 1, 2 and 3, Defendant is sentenced to probation for a term of: 3 years. This term of probation consists of a 3-year term imposed on each of Counts 1, 2, and 3 of the Information, to be served concurrently. Special Assessment: $925.00 (paid). Fine: $6,790,000.00 (paid). Restitution: $83,008.19. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 4/15/15. (djs)
GPO Apr 15 2015
JUDGMENT as to Defendant Austin DeCoster (2), Count 3, Defendant committed to BOP for 3 months on Count 3 of the Information. Supervised Release for 1 year. Assessment $25.00 (paid). Fine $100,000.00 (paid). Restitution $83,008.19. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 04/15/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Opinion) (src)
GPO Jun 22 2017
AMENDED Judgment as to Defendant Peter DeCoster (3). Defendant committed to BOP for 3 months on Count 3 of the Information. Supervised release for 1 year. Assessment of $25.00 (paid). Fine of $100,000.00. (paid). Restitution of $83,008.19. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 6/22/2017. (src)
GPO Jun 22 2017
AMENDED Judgment as to Defendant Austin DeCoster (2): Count 3: Defendant committed to BOP for 3 months: Defendant on supervised release for 12 months: $25 special assessment (paid): $100,000.00 fine (paid): $83,008.19 restitution. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 06/22/17. (kfs)

1. Former Egg Executives Receive Three-Month Sentence (wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 04/14/2015
Docket last updated: 04/14/2015 11:58 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2014
Judge update in case as to Quality Egg, LLC, Austin DeCoster, Peter DeCoster. Senior Judge Donald E OBrien and Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand added. (Conflicts checked as to parties, attorneys Volpe, Green, and Dornan; none found) (pac)
Related: [-]
4 4 INFORMATION as to Quality Egg, LLC (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Austin DeCoster (2) count 3, Peter DeCoster (3) count 3. (NEF and Information e-mailed to attorneys Green and Volpe with ECF Registration Form) (pac)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER to Continue - Ends of Justice as to Defendant Austin DeCoster. Time excluded from 5/21/14 until 6/3/14. Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Change of Plea Hearing set for 6/3/2014 11:00 AM in SC 1st Fl Ct before Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 5/21/14. (copy w/nef emailed to non-ecf attys Green and Volpe) (djs) (djs).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/22/2014) Confirmation Receipt