Original Case: 3:14-cr-03024

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cr-01890
Typecriminal / direct criminal
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2015
Terminated:Jul 06, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Jul 07, 2016 5:00 AM CDT
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
National Association of Manufacturers
Represented By
Randal J. Meyer
CATO INSTITUTE
contact info
Ilya Shapiro
CATO INSTITUTE
contact info
Scott Steven Bernstein
KAISER & LEGRAND
contact info
Patrick N. Forrest
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS
contact info
Linda E. Kelly
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS
contact info
Matthew Gardner Kaiser
KAISER & LEGRAND
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
CATO INSTITUTE
Represented By
Randal J. Meyer
CATO INSTITUTE
contact info
Ilya Shapiro
CATO INSTITUTE
contact info
Scott Steven Bernstein
KAISER & LEGRAND
contact info
Patrick N. Forrest
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS
contact info
Linda E. Kelly
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS
contact info
Matthew Gardner Kaiser
KAISER & LEGRAND
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
Washington Legal Foundation
Represented By
Mark S. Chenoweth
WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION
contact info
Cory L. Andrews
WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
Chamber of Commerce of the United States
Represented By
Paul Reinherz Wolfson
WILMER & HALE
contact info
David W. Ogden
WILMER & HALE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s)
Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Represented By
Paul Reinherz Wolfson
WILMER & HALE
contact info
David W. Ogden
WILMER & HALE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Austin DeCoster, also known as Jack
Represented By
Austin DeCoster
contact info
Peter D. Keisler
SIDLEY & AUSTIN
contact info
Frank Robert Volpe
SIDLEY & AUSTIN
contact info
Mark Daniel Hopson
SIDLEY & AUSTIN
contact info
Thomas C. Green
SIDLEY & AUSTIN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America
Represented By
Martin Joseph McLaughlin
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Lisa Hsiao
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Jeffrey Eric Sandberg
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Scott R. McIntosh
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Christopher E. Parisi
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Peter E. Deegan Jr.
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info

GPO Jul 06 2016
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Diana E. Murphy, C. Arlen Beam and Raymond W. Gruender
AUTHORING JUDGE:Diana E. Murphy (PUBLISHED),
DISSENT BY: C. Arlen Beam,
CONCUR BY: Raymond W. Gruender [4422226] [15-1890, 15-1891]

Docket last updated: 07/07/2016 5:00 AM CDT
Thursday, April 30, 2015
CRIMINAL case docketed. [4270448] 15-1890 15-1891 (DMW)
Related: [-]
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Judgment of 4/15/15; Memorandum & Order regarding defendant's motions prior to sentencing 4/15/15. [4270473] 15-1890 (DMW)
Related: [-]
CRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due 05/20/2015. PSI report due 05/20/2015. Brief of appellant Austin DeCoster due 06/03/2015 *AND* Brief of appellant Peter DeCoster due 06/01/2015. Appellee brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Appellants' reply brief is due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee's brief. [4270490] 15-1890 15-1891 (DMW)
Related: [-]