Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30229

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 3:20-ap-03062
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2020
Terminated:Jun 07, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith
410 Precita Ave
San Francisco, CA 94110
Represented By
Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith
contact info
Defendant
Elendow Fund, LLC
3329 Sundance Dr.
Bozeman, MT 59715
Represented By
Elendow Fund, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Owen Boom
1299 Fourth St
San Rafael, CA 94901
Represented By
Owen Boom
contact info
Defendant
Skye Baine
1299 Fourth St
San Rafael, CA 94901
Represented By
Skye Baine
contact info
Defendant
Matt Weinstein
5883 Lucas Valley Rd
Novato, CA 94946
Represented By
Matt Weinstein
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth B. Macher, individually and as Custodian of the Kenneth B. Macher IRA
354 Forrest Ave.
Fairfax, CA 94930
Represented By
Kenneth B. Macher
contact info
Defendant
Evelyn De Buhr
4920 Wailapa Rd
Kilauea, HI 96754
Represented By
Evelyn De Buhr
contact info
Defendant
Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust
P.O. Box 695
Albany, CA 94706
Represented By
Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust
contact info
Defendant
Melvin Meyer IRA
410 Precita Ave
San Francisco, CA 94110
Represented By
Melvin Meyer IRA
contact info
Defendant
Rosemary Smith IRA
410 Precita Ave
San Francisco, CA 94110
Represented By
Rosemary Smith IRA
contact info
Defendant
Nancy Kadian
7001 Maple Ave
Chevy Chase, MD 20815
Represented By
Nancy Kadian
contact info
Defendant
Mark Kubik IRA
192 Caribe Isle
Novato, CA 94949
Represented By
Mark Kubik IRA
contact info
Defendant
Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K
721 Kumukahi Pl.
Honolulu, HI 96825
Represented By
Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K
contact info
Defendant
Anna Victoria Mac Donald
61 Corva Way
Silver City, NV 88061
Represented By
Anna Victoria Mac Donald
contact info
Defendant
M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan
7 Wainwright Rd. Unit 22
Winchester, MA 01890
Represented By
M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan
contact info
Defendant
Sarah Fisk IRA
2908 Benvenue Ave
Berkeley, CA 94705
Represented By
Sarah Fisk IRA
contact info
Defendant
M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP
7 Wainwright Rd. Unit 22
Winchester, MA 01890
Represented By
M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP
contact info
Defendant
M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP
7 Wainwright Rd. Unit 22
Winchester, MA 01890
Represented By
M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP
contact info
Defendant
Laurie B. Di Lorenzo, individually and as Trustee of the Laurie B. Di Lorenzo IRA
7 Wainwright Rd. Unit 22
Winchester, MA 01890
Represented By
Laurie B. Di Lorenzo
contact info
Defendant
J. Goforth
2844 NE 117 St.
Seattle, WA 98125
Represented By
J. Goforth
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Michael Wentzell
2201 Minnesota Ave
Anacortes, WA 98221
Represented By
Joseph Michael Wentzell
contact info
Defendant
David Less
2302 Lancaster Dr.
Austin, TX 78748
Represented By
David Less
contact info
Defendant
David Lustig, as Trustee of the Lustig Family 1990 Trust and as Custodian of the David Lustig IRA
P.O. Box 532
Pescadero, CA 94060
Represented By
David Lustig
contact info
Defendant
Eileen Dingle
306 Clubhouse Dr.
Aptos, CA 95003
Represented By
Eileen Dingle
contact info
Defendant
Taj Inayat, individually and as Custodian of the Taj Inayat IRA
533 Hayes Lane
Petaluma, CA 94952
Represented By
Taj Inayat
contact info
Defendant
Playfair Pension
5883 Lucas Valley Rd
Novato, CA 94946
Represented By
Playfair Pension
contact info
Defendant
Robbins Family Trust
420 Bronco Rd
Soquel, CA 95073
Represented By
Robbins Family Trust
contact info
Defendant
Frank Rothschild
4920 Wailapa Rd
Kilauea, HI 96754
Represented By
Frank Rothschild
contact info
Defendant
Geneen Roth
1299 Fourth St
San Rafael, CA 94901
Represented By
Geneen Roth
contact info
Defendant
Stephen Howard Stern
50 Sunrise Lane
Larkspur, CA 94939
Represented By
Stephen Howard Stern
contact info
Defendant
A. Roy Sussman
6 Upton St.
Cambridge, MA 02139
Represented By
A. Roy Sussman
contact info
Defendant
Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA
33931 Faeroe Bay
Dana Points, CA 92629
Represented By
Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA
contact info
Defendant
Yves Oberlin
1608 Windsor Rd
Austin, TX 78703
Represented By
Yves Oberlin
contact info
Defendant
Fatima Lassar
32 Fairview Terrace
Petaluma, CA 94952
Represented By
Fatima Lassar
contact info
Defendant
Rodney Kreps
2844 NE 117 St.
Seattle, WA 98125
Represented By
Rodney Kreps
contact info
Defendant
S&K, LLC
420 Golden Gate Point No. 301
Sarasota, FL 34236
Represented By
S&K, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust
3451 Road I
Redwood Valley, CA 95470
Represented By
Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust
contact info
Defendant
2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust
192 Caribe Isle
Novato, CA 94949
Represented By
2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda S. Green, Trustee in Bankruptcy of the Estate of Lakeview Investment, L.P.
P.O. Box 5350
Santa Rosa, CA 95402
Represented By
John H. MacConaghy
Macconaghy & Barnier, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/07 11:09 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3062. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Mon 05/23 10:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee. Amount 350.00 from Linda S. Green. Receipt Number 30067370. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
23 23 court Clerk's Notice of Fees Due Thu 12/10 11:43 AM
Clerk's Notice of Fees Due in the Amount of $ 350.00 for 3:20-ap-3062 Related [+]. (no)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green
Monday, November 23, 2020
22 22 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/23 4:56 PM
Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Case For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Related [+] Case Management Action due after 12/7/2020. (lp)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, November 20, 2020
21 21 audio audio Fri 11/20 8:55 PM
The Audio File attached to the PDF includes several hearings. Court Date & Time [ 11/20/2020 10:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 15165 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:03:10 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held (Adv) Fri 11/20 2:16 PM
Telephonic Hearing Held. John MacConaghy appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. David Chandler, Jr. appeared on behalf of the defendants. The motion to dismiss is granted without leave to amend for the reasons stated on the record. Mr. Chandler will upload an order. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust, Skye Baine, Owen Boom, Evelyn De Buhr, Laurie B. Di Lorenzo, Eileen Dingle, Elendow Fund, LLC, J. Goforth, Taj Inayat, Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA, Nancy Kadian, Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust, Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K, Rodney Kreps, Fatima Lassar, David Less, M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP, M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan, M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP, Anna Victoria Mac Donald, Kenneth B. Macher, Mark Kubik IRA, Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust, Melvin Meyer IRA, Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith, Yves Oberlin, Playfair Pension, Robbins Family Trust, Rosemary Smith IRA, Geneen Roth, Frank Rothschild, S&K, LLC, Sarah Fisk IRA, Stephen Howard Stern, A. Roy Sussman, Matt Weinstein, Joseph Michael Wentzell
court Hearing Dropped Fri 11/20 2:16 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Linda S. Green
Friday, November 13, 2020
20 20 misc Reply Fri 11/13 5:39 PM
Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To Motion To Dismiss Case For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Related [+]. Filed by Defendants 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust, Skye Baine, Owen Boom, Evelyn De Buhr, Laurie B. Di Lorenzo, Eileen Dingle, Elendow Fund, LLC, J. Goforth, Taj Inayat, Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA, Nancy Kadian, Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust, Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K, Rodney Kreps, Fatima Lassar, David Less, M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP, M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan, M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP, Anna Victoria Mac Donald, Kenneth B. Macher, Mark Kubik IRA, Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust, Melvin Meyer IRA, Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith, Yves Oberlin, Playfair Pension, Robbins Family Trust, Rosemary Smith IRA, Geneen Roth, Frank Rothschild, S&K, LLC, Sarah Fisk IRA, Stephen Howard Stern, A. Roy Sussman, Matt Weinstein, Joseph Michael Wentzell (Chandler, David)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
19 19 misc Status Conference Statement Fri 11/13 4:50 PM
Status Conference Statement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Friday, November 06, 2020
18 18 13 pgs misc Memorandum of Points & Authorities Fri 11/06 4:16 PM
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition of Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, October 22, 2020
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 10/22 10:12 AM
Hearing Continued. The scheduling conference on 10/30 is continued to 11/20 at 10:30 am. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2020 at 10:30 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Linda S. Green
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 10/21 6:03 PM
Notice of Hearing On Motion to Dismiss Case For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (w/proof of service) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2020 at 10:30 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Defendants 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust, Skye Baine, Owen Boom, Evelyn De Buhr, Laurie B. Di Lorenzo, Eileen Dingle, Elendow Fund, LLC, J. Goforth, Taj Inayat, Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA, Nancy Kadian, Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust, Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K, Rodney Kreps, Fatima Lassar, David Less, M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP, M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan, M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP, Anna Victoria Mac Donald, Kenneth B. Macher, Mark Kubik IRA, Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust, Melvin Meyer IRA, Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith, Yves Oberlin, Playfair Pension, Robbins Family Trust, Rosemary Smith IRA, Geneen Roth, Frank Rothschild, S&K, LLC, Sarah Fisk IRA, Stephen Howard Stern, A. Roy Sussman, Matt Weinstein, Joseph Michael Wentzell. (Chandler, David)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
16 16 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/21 5:59 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted; Memorandum Of Points and Authorities (Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 12(b)(6)) Filed by Defendants 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust, Skye Baine, Owen Boom, Evelyn De Buhr, Laurie B. Di Lorenzo, Eileen Dingle, Elendow Fund, LLC, J. Goforth, Taj Inayat, Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA, Nancy Kadian, Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust, Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K, Rodney Kreps, Fatima Lassar, David Less, M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP, M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan, M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP, Anna Victoria Mac Donald, Kenneth B. Macher, Mark Kubik IRA, Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust, Melvin Meyer IRA, Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith, Yves Oberlin, Playfair Pension, Robbins Family Trust, Rosemary Smith IRA, Geneen Roth, Frank Rothschild, S&K, LLC, Sarah Fisk IRA, Stephen Howard Stern, A. Roy Sussman, Matt Weinstein, Joseph Michael Wentzell. (Chandler, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
15 15 misc Statement Tue 10/20 3:07 PM
Statement of Joint Report Re: Status of Pleadings Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] Judge Docket Order
court Hearing Dropped Tue 10/20 4:05 PM
Hearing Dropped. The hearing on 10/23/20 at 10:30 am is dropped from the calendar. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust, Skye Baine, Owen Boom, Evelyn De Buhr, Laurie B. Di Lorenzo, Eileen Dingle, Elendow Fund, LLC, J. Goforth, Taj Inayat, Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA, Nancy Kadian, Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust, Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K, Rodney Kreps, David Less, M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP, M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan, M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP, Anna Victoria Mac Donald, Kenneth B. Macher, Mark Kubik IRA, Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust, Melvin Meyer IRA, Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith, Yves Oberlin, Playfair Pension, Robbins Family Trust, Rosemary Smith IRA, Geneen Roth, Frank Rothschild, S&K, LLC, Sarah Fisk IRA, Stephen Howard Stern, A. Roy Sussman, Matt Weinstein, Joseph Michael Wentzell
Monday, October 19, 2020
order Judge Docket Order Mon 10/19 4:11 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) Mr. MacConaghy and Mr. Chandler are directed to file a joint statement by COB on October 21, 2020, clarifying the following: Does the complaint filed as Doc. 14 on October 7, 2020, amend the complaint filed as Doc. 1 on August 10, 2020? If not, what is the court to do with two complaints filed in the same adversary proceeding? Does Doc. 14 moot the Motion to Dismiss filed by Mr. Chandler on September 24, 2020 (Doc. No. 11) and is on calendar for October 23? If not, what is the court to do with the unopposed motion? If so, what should the court schedule by way of future hearings in this adversary proceeding? Does Mr. Chandler represent Mr. Rodney Krebs, who is named in the Motion to Dismiss, but who filed his own response (Doc. No. 10) that the court has treated as an answer? (Montali, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/07 12:51 PM
Amended Complaint by John H. MacConaghy on behalf of Linda S. Green against all defendants. Related [+]. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -- Limited Partnership Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - List of transfers
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/30 12:18 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant David Lustig as Trustee of the Lustig Family 1990 Trust and as Custodian of the David Lustig IRA of the Case Management Action due after 10/14/2020. Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 09/24 8:36 PM
Notice of Hearing On Motion To Dismiss Case For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 10:30 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Defendants 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust, Skye Baine, Owen Boom, Evelyn De Buhr, Laurie B. Di Lorenzo, Eileen Dingle, Elendow Fund, LLC, J. Goforth, Taj Inayat, Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA, Nancy Kadian, Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust, Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K, Rodney Kreps, David Less, M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP, M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan, M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP, Anna Victoria Mac Donald, Kenneth B. Macher, Mark Kubik IRA, Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust, Melvin Meyer IRA, Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith, Yves Oberlin, Playfair Pension, Robbins Family Trust, Rosemary Smith IRA, Geneen Roth, Frank Rothschild, S&K, LLC, Sarah Fisk IRA, Stephen Howard Stern, A. Roy Sussman, Matt Weinstein, Joseph Michael Wentzell. (Chandler, David)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant David Less, Defendant Eileen Dingle, Defendant Taj Inayat, Defendant Playfair Pension, Defendant Robbins Family Trust, Defendant Frank Rothschild, Defendant Geneen Roth, Defendant Stephen Howard Stern, Defendant A. Roy Sussman, Defendant Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA, Defendant Yves Oberlin, Defendant Rodney Kreps, Defendant S&K, LLC, Defendant Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust, Defendant 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust, Defendant Joseph Michael Wentzell, Defendant Nancy Kadian, Defendant Elendow Fund, LLC, Defendant Owen Boom, Defendant Skye Baine, Defendant Matt Weinstein, Defendant Kenneth B. Macher, Defendant Evelyn De Buhr, Defendant Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust, Defendant Melvin Meyer IRA, Defendant Rosemary Smith IRA, Defendant Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith, Defendant Mark Kubik IRA, Defendant Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K, Defendant Anna Victoria Mac Donald, Defendant M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan, Defendant Sarah Fisk IRA, Defendant M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP, Defendant M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP, Defendant Laurie B. Di Lorenzo, Defendant J. Goforth
11 11 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/24 8:02 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 12(b)(6) Filed by Defendants 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust, Skye Baine, Owen Boom, Evelyn De Buhr, Laurie B. Di Lorenzo, Eileen Dingle, Elendow Fund, LLC, J. Goforth, Taj Inayat, Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA, Nancy Kadian, Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust, Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K, Rodney Kreps, David Less, M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP, M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan, M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP, Anna Victoria Mac Donald, Kenneth B. Macher, Mark Kubik IRA, Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust, Melvin Meyer IRA, Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith, Yves Oberlin, Playfair Pension, Robbins Family Trust, Rosemary Smith IRA, Geneen Roth, Frank Rothschild, S&K, LLC, Sarah Fisk IRA, Stephen Howard Stern, A. Roy Sussman, Matt Weinstein, Joseph Michael Wentzell. (Chandler, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/03 12:57 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Rodney Kreps . (tm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/18 5:15 PM
Summons Service Executed on 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust 8/17/2020; Skye Baine 8/17/2020; Owen Boom 8/17/2020; Evelyn De Buhr 8/17/2020; Laurie B. Di Lorenzo 8/17/2020; Eileen Dingle 8/17/2020; Elendow Fund, LLC 8/17/2020; J. Goforth 8/17/2020; Linda S. Green 8/18/2020; Taj Inayat 8/17/2020; Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA 8/17/2020; Nancy Kadian 8/17/2020; Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust 8/17/2020; Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K 8/17/2020; Rodney Kreps 8/17/2020; Fatima Lassar 8/17/2020; David Less 8/17/2020; David Lustig 8/17/2020; M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP 8/17/2020; M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan 8/17/2020; M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP 8/17/2020; Anna Victoria Mac Donald 8/17/2020; Kenneth B. Macher 8/17/2020; Mark Kubik IRA 8/17/2020; Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust 8/17/2020; Melvin Meyer IRA 8/17/2020; Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith 8/17/2020; Yves Oberlin 8/17/2020; Playfair Pension 8/17/2020; Robbins Family Trust 8/17/2020; Rosemary Smith IRA 8/17/2020; Geneen Roth 8/17/2020; Frank Rothschild 8/17/2020; S&K, LLC 8/17/2020; Sarah Fisk IRA 8/17/2020; Stephen Howard Stern 8/17/2020; A. Roy Sussman 8/17/2020; Matt Weinstein 8/17/2020; Joseph Michael Wentzell 8/17/2020 . (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service list
Monday, August 17, 2020
8 8 order Defer Fee Mon 08/17 5:03 PM
Order to Defer Adversary Proceeding Filing Fee Related [+].Amount Tentatively Deferred: $350.00. (lp)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, August 13, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/13 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/13/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/13 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/13/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Discovery Order
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/13 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/13/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Discovery Order
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
4 4 order Discovery Tue 08/11 1:57 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (dts)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 08/11 1:56 PM
Summons Issued on 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust Answer Due 9/10/2020; Skye Baine Answer Due 9/10/2020; Owen Boom Answer Due 9/10/2020; Evelyn De Buhr Answer Due 9/10/2020; Laurie B. Di Lorenzo Answer Due 9/10/2020; Eileen Dingle Answer Due 9/10/2020; Elendow Fund, LLC Answer Due 9/10/2020; J. Goforth Answer Due 9/10/2020; Taj Inayat Answer Due 9/10/2020; Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA Answer Due 9/10/2020; Nancy Kadian Answer Due 9/10/2020; Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust Answer Due 9/10/2020; Kokua Integrative Healthcare Co., Inc. 401K Answer Due 9/10/2020; Rodney Kreps Answer Due 9/10/2020; Fatima Lassar Answer Due 9/10/2020; David Less Answer Due 9/10/2020; David Lustig Answer Due 9/10/2020; M.J. Di Lorenzo DBPP Answer Due 9/10/2020; M.J. Di Lorenzo Defined Benefit Pension Plan Answer Due 9/10/2020; M.J. Di Lorenzo MPPP Answer Due 9/10/2020; Anna Victoria Mac Donald Answer Due 9/10/2020; Kenneth B. Macher Answer Due 9/10/2020; Mark Kubik IRA Answer Due 9/10/2020; Mary Harper and Jim Lerager Family Trust Answer Due 9/10/2020; Melvin Meyer IRA Answer Due 9/10/2020; Melvin Meyer and Rosemary Smith Answer Due 9/10/2020; Yves Oberlin Answer Due 9/10/2020; Playfair Pension Answer Due 9/10/2020; Robbins Family Trust Answer Due 9/10/2020; Rosemary Smith IRA Answer Due 9/10/2020; Geneen Roth Answer Due 9/10/2020; Frank Rothschild Answer Due 9/10/2020; S&K, LLC Answer Due 9/10/2020; Sarah Fisk IRA Answer Due 9/10/2020; Stephen Howard Stern Answer Due 9/10/2020; A. Roy Sussman Answer Due 9/10/2020; Matt Weinstein Answer Due 9/10/2020; Joseph Michael Wentzell Answer Due 9/10/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/30/2020 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (dts)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green
Monday, August 10, 2020
2 2 motion Defer Fee Mon 08/10 5:00 PM
Application to Defer Fee Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/10 4:37 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03062 . 14 Related [+] Complaint by Linda S. Green against David Less, David Lustig, Eileen Dingle, Taj Inayat, Playfair Pension, Matthew Weinstein, Kenneth Macher, Robbins Family Trust, Frank Rothschild, Evelyn Buhr, Mary Harper & Jim Lerager Family Trust, Geneen Roth, Stephen Howard Stern, A. Roy Sussman, Joseph S. D'Antony Rollover IRA, Yves Oberlin, Fatima Lassar, Melvin Meyer, Melvin Meyer, Rodney Kreps, Mark Kubik, S&K, LLC, Kathleen F. Azarnoff Trust, 2000 Mark & Nancy Kubik Revocable Trust, Kokua Integrative Healthcare Solutions Inc. 401k, Anna Victoria MacDonald, M.J. DiLorenzo DBPP, M.J. DiLorenzo MPPP, Joseph Michael Wentzell, Nancy Kadian, Sarah Fisk, Laurie Di Lorenzo, Elendow Fund, LLC, J Goforth, Owen Boom, Skye Baine. Fee Tentatively Deferred, Application to be Filed. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Limited Partnership Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 -- Spreadsheet of transferees
Att: 3 AP Cover Sheet