California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 3:20-bk-30229
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Jun 03, 2020
Claims Deadline:Aug 19, 2020
Terminated:Oct 24, 2024

Debtor
Grace & Company, G.P.
1299 4th St. #205
San, CA 94901
Represented By
Richard M. Glantz
Law Offices Of Richard M. Glantz
contact info
John G. Warner
Law Offices Of John G. Warner
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Linda S. Green
P.O.Box 5350
Santa Rosa, CA 95402
Represented By
Jean Barnier
Macconaghy And Barnier
contact info
John H. MacConaghy
Macconaghy And Barnier
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 06/10/2024 8:09 AM PDT
Monday, March 02, 2020
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Mon 03/02 2:05 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/01/2020 at 09:00 AM at Santa Rosa U.S. Trustee Office. (ds)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Mon 03/02 8:55 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Amount 335.00 from Law And Mediation Offices Of R. Receipt Number 30066317. (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 03/02 2:05 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335.00. Filed by Grace & Company, G.P. . Order Meeting of Creditors due by 3/16/2020. (ds)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SFA
2 2 misc Creditor Matrix Mon 03/02 3:11 PM
Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Grace & Company, G.P. (ds)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Document Mon 03/02 3:15 PM
Documents: Partnership Ownership Statement and Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Grace & Company, G.P. (ds)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
4 4 court Generate 341 Notices Mon 03/02 3:16 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines (Generated) (ds)
Related: [-]