Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30229

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 3:20-ap-03063
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2020
Terminated:Jun 02, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Richard M. Glantz
1299 Fourth St
San Rafael, CA 94901
Represented By
Richard M. Glantz
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy W. Hoffman, Trustee in Bankruptcy of EJS Associates, L.P.
P.O. Box 1761
Sebastopol, CA 95473
Represented By
John H. MacConaghy
Macconaghy And Barnier
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, June 02, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/02 3:19 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3063. (lj)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Mon 05/23 10:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee. Amount 350.00 from Linda S. Green. Receipt Number 30067369. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
8 8 court Clerk's Notice of Fees Due Mon 08/30 8:32 AM
Clerk's Notice of Fees Due in the Amount of $ 350.00 for 3:20-ap-3063 Related [+]. (dc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
court Hearing Dropped Wed 11/04 2:39 PM
Hearing Dropped. The scheduling conference on 11/20/20 at 1:30 pm is taken off calendar. Stipulation to Dismiss, dkt #7, filed on 10/29/20. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Timothy W. Hoffman
Thursday, October 29, 2020
7 7 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/29 4:13 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Without Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman. Case Management Action due after 11/12/2020. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 10/28 4:49 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2020 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Timothy W. Hoffman
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/18 5:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on Richard M. Glantz 8/16/2020 . (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
5 5 order Defer Fee Mon 08/17 5:04 PM
Order to Defer Adversary Proceeding Filing Fee Related [+].Amount Tentatively Deferred: $350.00. (lp)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
4 4 order Discovery Tue 08/11 8:36 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lb)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 08/11 8:35 AM
Summons Issued on Richard M. Glantz Answer Due 9/10/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/30/2020 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman
Monday, August 10, 2020
2 2 motion Defer Fee Mon 08/10 6:23 PM
Application to Defer Fee Filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/10 6:19 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03063 . 14 Related [+] Complaint by Timothy W. Hoffman against Richard M Glantz. Fee Tentatively Deferred, Application to be Filed. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet