Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30229

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 3:20-ap-03064
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2020
Terminated:Jun 02, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Richard M Glantz
1299 Fourth St
San Rafael, CA 94901
Represented By
Richard M Glantz
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy W. Hoffman, Trustee in Bankruptcy of the Estate of Jelris & Associates, L.P.
P.O. Box 1761
Sebastopol, CA 95473
Represented By
John H. MacConaghy
Macconaghy And Barnier
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, June 02, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/02 5:43 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:20-ap-3064. (klr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Mon 05/23 10:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee. Amount 350.00 from Linda S. Green. Receipt Number 30067371. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
8 8 court Clerk's Notice of Fees Due Wed 08/11 8:27 AM
Clerk's Notice of Fees Due in the Amount of $ 350.00 for 3:20-ap-3064 Related [+]. (dc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
court Hearing Dropped Wed 11/04 2:40 PM
Hearing Dropped. The scheduling conference on 11/20/20 at 1:30 pm is taken off calendar. Stipulation to Dismiss, dkt #7, filed on 10/29/20. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Timothy W. Hoffman
Thursday, October 29, 2020
7 7 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/29 4:14 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Without Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman. Case Management Action due after 11/12/2020. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 10/28 4:50 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2020 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Timothy W. Hoffman
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/18 5:30 PM
Summons Service Executed on Richard M Glantz 8/16/2020 . (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
5 5 order Defer Fee Mon 08/17 5:04 PM
Order to Defer Adversary Proceeding Filing Fee Related [+].Amount Tentatively Deferred: $350.00. (lp)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
4 4 order Discovery Tue 08/11 1:21 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (ka)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 08/11 1:20 PM
Summons Issued on Richard M Glantz Answer Due 9/10/2020 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/30/2020 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (ka)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman
Monday, August 10, 2020
2 2 motion Defer Fee Mon 08/10 6:33 PM
Application to Defer Fee Filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/10 6:30 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-03064 . 14 Related [+] Complaint by Timothy W. Hoffman against Richard M Glantz. Fee Tentatively Deferred, Application to be Filed. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet