Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. v. RREAF Holdings, LLC et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristi H Johnson |
Referred: | Lakeysha Greer Isaac |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-00526 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 09, 2021 3:43 AM CST |
Counter Claimant
Bradford Byram, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
RREAF Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bradford Byram, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RREAF Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, August 25, 2022 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 08/25 9:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
Friday, June 03, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate
Fri 06/03 4:20 PM
CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE as to35 Notice of Appeal filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.(CO) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
appeal
Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted
Mon 11/22 3:45 PM
ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL ACCEPTED : The Court of Appeals has accepted the Electronic Record on Appeal and it is available for attorney access and download at[LINK:http://http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf] using credentials provided to you by the Clerk of that Court. COUNSEL MUST HAVE AN APPEARANCE FORM ON FILE. If you have not filed it and/or have just filed it, please allow 3-5 days for processing. Requirements: Java 1.7, Adobe Acrobat Reader 11, turn off pop up blockers or add CM/ECF filing system to approved pop up settings. Pro Se Parties should request the record from the Clerks Office. (CO) |
||
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 11/19 1:35 PM
USCA Case Number 21-60879 for35 Notice of Appeal filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. Initial Case Check letter advising of case number and procedures. (CO) |
|
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Fri 11/19 2:02 PM
Certified and Electronically Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re35 Notice of Appeal. Once the record has been accepted, a separate docket entry will be made notifying parties that they may then access the record via the Fifth Circuit website. (CO) |
||
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 11/15 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMSSDC-4705526. (Schepens, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 10/26 4:04 PM
ORDER Denying24 Senecas Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting26 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 10/26/2021 (CO) |
|
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
order
Order
Fri 10/15 8:20 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER staying the Pretrial Conference pending ruling on the outstanding motions. Upon ruling on the motions, if necessary, the Court will schedule a pretrial conference along with the associated deadlines. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 10/15/21. (KJ) |
||
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 10/01 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference is set for November 5, 2021, at 1:00 PM, in Courtroom 4B (Jackson) Johnson before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson. NOTE: NO LATER THAN NOON the day before the pretrial conference, counsel for the parties are to email the proposed joint pretrial order to Chambers. Trial is currently set for two-week trial term beginning December 6, 2021. (RT) |
|
Thursday, August 12, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 08/12 6:11 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 08/10 5:13 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Schepens, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
respoth
Response in Opposition
Thu 08/05 2:23 PM
Response in Opposition re27 MEMORANDUM in Support re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew),26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC(Harris, Andrew) filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Schepens, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, August 03, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 08/03 5:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 08/03 5:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
23
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 07/22 3:31 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 07/22 3:31 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC(Harris, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Doe Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - CGL Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Umbrella Policy, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Reservation of Rights Letter, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Docket Sheet in Doe Lawsuit | ||
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 07/21 11:51 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #24 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number AND a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (cwl) |
||
Tuesday, July 20, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
12
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 07/20 5:31 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Schepens, Patrick) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 07/20 5:27 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.(Schepens, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Thursday, July 08, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Deadline
Thu 07/08 11:17 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline by one week. Motions due by 7/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 7/8/2021 (BB) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Extend Deadline
Thu 07/08 10:25 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline by One Week by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Deadline
Thu 07/08 11:18 AM
***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Unopposed22 Motion to Extend Deadline. Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2021. NO FURTHER ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 7/8/21. (KJ) Modified on 7/8/2021 (KNS) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 07/08 11:29 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to TEXT ONLY ORDER of 07/08/2021: Duplicate order. (KNS) |
||
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
notice
Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY
Tue 06/22 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. Settlement Conference set for July 8, 2021 at 9:00 am is cancelled at the request of the parties. The parties shall contact the Court to reschedule the Settlement Conference when the parties are prepared to proceed. (BB) |
||
Friday, May 21, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Deadline
Fri 05/21 9:13 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting21 Motion to Extend Motions Deadline. It is ordered that the Motions deadline shall be extended by thirty (30) days. Motions due by 7/15/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 5/21/2021 (BB) |
||
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extend Deadline
Thu 05/20 3:57 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Dispositive/Daubert-type Motions Deadline by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
discov
Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production
Fri 02/05 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Williams, Matthew) |
|
19 | 19
discov
Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories
Fri 02/05 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Williams, Matthew) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
order
Case Management Order
Fri 01/08 4:52 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Bench Trial set for 12/6/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B (Jackson) Johnson before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson; Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2021, time to be determined, in Chambers 4.550 (Jackson) Johnson before District Judge Kristi H. Johnson ; Settlement Conference set for 7/8/2021 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Isaac before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 10/29/2021. All other case management deadlines remain unchanged. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 1/8/21 (Lewis, Nijah) |
||
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 01/06 10:13 AM
Parties should include the case number new judge assignment of 3:20cv526KHJ-LGI on future filings. (MGB) |
||
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
13
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 01/06 10:11 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 1/5/21 (MGB) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
5
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 12/14 8:00 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Kristi H. Johnson for all further proceedings. District Judge Henry T. Wingate no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 12/14/20 (MGB) |
|
utility
Remark
Mon 12/14 8:00 PM
Attorneys are advised to include the case number and new judge assignment of 3:20-cv-526KHJ-LRA on future pleadings. (MGB) |
||
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Notice of Service of Request for Production
Thu 12/10 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
15 | 15
discov
Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Thu 12/10 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
discov
Notice of Service of Disclosure
Mon 11/16 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Notice of Service of Disclosure
Mon 11/16 3:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct event (ND) |
|
12 | 12
discov
Notice of Service of Disclosure
Mon 11/16 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosure by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Williams, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Case Management Order
Mon 11/09 3:29 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 11/9/2020 ; Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate ; Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 6/1/2021; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2020; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 12/9/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 3/2/2021 ; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 4/1/2021; Motions due by 6/15/2021; Settlement Conference set for 7/8/2021 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson ; ADR Report due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/9/20 (Lewis, Nijah) |
|
minutes
Telephonic Case Management Conference
Mon 11/09 3:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/9/2020. Participants: Patrick Schepens and Andrew Harris. The Court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (Lewis, Nijah) |
||
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 10/22 4:15 PM
ANSWER to8 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc..(Schepens, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Rule 16(a) Initial Order
Tue 10/06 3:18 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) |
|
Thursday, October 01, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 10/01 4:06 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Defenses, and , COUNTERCLAIM against Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC.(Harris, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A First Amended Complaint | ||
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 09/16 10:23 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants RREAF Holdings, LLCs and Bradford Byram, LLCs deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to October 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/16/2020 (Lewis, Nijah) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 09/16 9:16 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC (Harris, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/15 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. RREAF Holdings, LLC served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Williams, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/10 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Williams on behalf of Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Williams, Matthew) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/31 2:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. Bradford Byram, LLC served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Williams, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/20 10:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Bradford Byram, LLC and RREAF Holdings, LLC. (ND) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/13 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Bradford Byram, LLC, RREAF Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4345893), filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc..(MGB) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |