Member Case
Lead case is: 7:20-bk-22962

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 7:20-bk-22961
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2020
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Balduccis New York LLC
15 Palmer Ave
Scarsdale, NY 10583-7127
Represented By
Steve Y Ma
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Monday, April 15, 2024
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 04/15 9:52 AM
Case Closed. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
5 5 order ~Generic~ Order Tue 03/26 5:57 PM
Final Decree Closing The Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Signed On 3/26/2024 (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Mon 11/09 2:27 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. This case is joint administrative. All documents and Schedules are to be filed on the lead case No. 20-22962 (Tavarez, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
misc Add Claims and Noticing Agent Fri 08/28 10:31 AM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
4 4 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 08/27 11:07 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers for Michael D. Bosso and John S. Groarke filed by Michael Dennis Bosso on behalf of UFCW Local 1500 Union. (Bosso, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Wed 08/26 9:34 AM
Case Joint Administration: An Order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Bankruptcy Rules directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of KB US Holdings, Inc.; KB Holding, Inc.; AG Kings Holdings Inc.; AG Holdings II Inc.; Kings Super Markets, Inc.; Balduccis Holdings LLC; Balduccis Connecticut LLC; Balduccis Maryland LLC; Balduccis Virginia LLC; and Balduccis New York LLC. The docket in Case No. 20-22962 (SHL) should be consulted for all matters affecting the case. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
3 3 order Motion, Joint Administration Tue 08/25 3:36 PM
Order Signed On 8/25/2020, Directing Joint Administration Of Related Chapter 11 Cases Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 2
Monday, August 24, 2020
misc Add Judge Mon 08/24 8:49 AM
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Mon 08/24 9:18 AM
Deficiencies Set: Section 521(i) Incomplete Filing Date: 10/7/2020. Schedule A/B due 9/8/2020. Schedule D due 9/8/2020. Schedule E/F due 9/8/2020. Schedule G due 9/8/2020. Schedule H due 9/8/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 9/8/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/8/2020. Atty Disclosure State. due 9/8/2020. List of all creditors due 9/8/2020. List of All Creditors Required on Case Docket in PDF Format due 9/8/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 9/8/2020, (Walker, Justin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 23, 2020
2 2 7 pgs motion Motion, Joint Administration Sun 08/23 10:31 PM
Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors Motion for Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Steve Y Ma on behalf of Balduccis New York LLC. (Ma, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
1 1 20 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 08/23 9:00 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Balduccis New York LLC Filed by Steve Y Ma of Proskauer Rose LLP on behalf of Balduccis New York LLC. (Ma, Steve)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Sun 08/23 9:51 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 20-22961 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14246836. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1