KB US Holdings, Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sean H Lane |
Case #: | 7:20-bk-22962 |
Case Filed: | Aug 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Plan Confirmed: | Feb 22, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
KB US Holdings, Inc.
700 Lanidex Plz
Parsippany, NJ 07054-2705 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
1. | King's Parent Company Files For Bankruptcy (myveronanj.com) |
Submitted Thu 08/27/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 04/15 9:56 AM
Case Closed. (Vargas, Ana) |