Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01199
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Dec 01, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Axiom Anesthesia Group, Inc.
3701 West 54th Street Suite B
Los Angeles, CA 90043
Represented By
Axiom Anesthesia Group, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/01 7:04 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1199 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
11 11 notice Notice Tue 11/17 12:09 PM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 01, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/01 8:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 30, 2020
9 9 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 10/30 4:29 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From November 3, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/30/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
8 8 misc Status report Tue 10/20 6:51 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/23 8:26 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Axiom Anesthesia Group, Inc.. (Mroczynski, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
6 6 misc Proof of service Fri 09/18 12:15 PM
Proof of service (Amended) of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Amended Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Monday, September 14, 2020
5 5 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:00 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 4 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 7:11 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, September 04, 2020
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 09/04 11:44 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 2:00 PM
Summons Issued on Axiom Anesthesia Group, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 7:35 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01199. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Axiom Anesthesia Group, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01199-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1