St. Vincent Medical Center v. 360 Support Services
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ernest M Robles |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-01210 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
360 Support Services
124 East Walnut Street Suite D
Monrovia, CA 91016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 11/02 9:21 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1210 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Evangelista, Maria) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Saturday, September 19, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Proof of service (Amended) of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Amended Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Fri 09/04 11:54 AM
Hearing Set Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on 360 Support Services Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Status hearing to be held on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 2:20-ap-01210. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against 360 Support Services. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01210-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |