Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01213
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
A Team Security, Inc.
11454 San Vicente Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90049
Represented By
A Team Security, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
24 24 notice Notice Tue 07/13 8:27 AM
Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 21 DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/4/2021 (RE: related document(s)17 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust). (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
23 23 court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/16 10:01 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1213 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/06 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
21 21 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Tue 05/04 12:58 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/4/2021 Related [+]. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust
Thursday, April 29, 2021
20 20 misc Declaration Thu 04/29 9:11 AM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, April 08, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of motion/application Thu 04/08 6:42 AM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Default Judgment Motion due by 05/6/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint # 3 Proposed Order)
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/07 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
17 17 motion Default Judgment (motion) Tue 04/06 12:14 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Default Judgment Motion due by 05/6/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, April 05, 2021
16 16 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 04/05 9:43 AM
Order: (1) Fixing May 7, 2021 As The Deadline For Plaintiff To File A Motion For Default Judgment And (2) Continuing Status Conference From April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To July 13, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/5/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
15 15 misc Status report Tue 03/23 1:35 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 17, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 12/17 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
13 13 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 12/15 3:46 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/15/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
12 12 misc Status report Tue 12/08 2:08 PM
Status report Filed by Defendant A Team Security, Inc. Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
11 11 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 11:47 AM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 11/05 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
9 9 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 11/03 1:18 PM
Order Setting Continued Status Conference For December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/3/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
8 8 court Hearing Held (Other) Tue 11/03 11:15 AM
Hearing Held re status conference - continued Status Conference is set for December 22, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
7 7 misc Status report Tue 10/20 1:02 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Saturday, September 19, 2020
6 6 misc Proof of service Sat 09/19 4:17 AM
Proof of service (Amended) of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Amended Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Monday, September 14, 2020
5 5 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:12 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 4 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 9:14 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 09/02 3:22 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 1:58 PM
Summons Issued on A Team Security, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 9:02 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01213. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against A Team Security, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01213-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1