Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01218
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alfredo F. Ramirez, MD
2820 Alum Rock Avenue
San Jose, CA 95127
Represented By
Alfredo F. Ramirez, MD
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 06, 2021
25 25 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/06 8:37 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1218 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/14 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Monday, April 12, 2021
23 23 2 pgs order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Mon 04/12 6:02 PM
Default Judgment In Favor Of Plaintiff (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/12/2021. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, April 08, 2021
22 22 misc Declaration Thu 04/08 8:50 AM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgement Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1
Att: 1 Order
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/07 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, April 05, 2021
20 20 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 04/05 9:38 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/5/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 02/23 12:07 PM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, February 18, 2021
18 18 motion Default Judgment (motion) Thu 02/18 2:09 PM
Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, February 05, 2021
17 17 misc Withdrawal re: Fri 02/05 3:49 PM
Withdrawal re: Notice Of Withdrawal of Docket Number 16 Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 16 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Thursday, February 04, 2021
16 16 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 02/04 5:45 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Alfredo F. Ramirez, MD Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Thursday, December 17, 2020
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 12/17 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
14 14 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 12/15 4:03 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/15/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
13 13 misc Status report Tue 12/08 7:09 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
12 12 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 11:51 AM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/04 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, November 02, 2020
10 10 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 11/02 10:01 AM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From November 3, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Answer Complaint No Later Than November 30, 2020 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/2/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
9 9 misc Status report Mon 11/02 5:13 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued, 8 Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Thursday, October 15, 2020
8 8 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 10/15 11:39 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. PDF attached is not an unfillable form and is not flattened THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT AS AN UNFILLABLE/ FLATTENED PDF IMMEDIATELY Related [+] (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 7 Status report filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
7 7 misc Status report Thu 10/15 7:57 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary) WARNING: PDF attached is not an unfillable form and is not flattened. See docket entry # 8 for corrective action; Modified on 10/15/2020 (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Saturday, September 19, 2020
6 6 misc Proof of service Sat 09/19 4:21 AM
Proof of service (Amended) of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Amended Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Monday, September 14, 2020
5 5 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:16 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 09/10 4:21 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
3 3 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 9:18 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 3:14 PM
Summons Issued on Alfredo F. Ramirez, MD Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 9:14 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01218. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against Alfredo F. Ramirez, MD. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01218-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1