St. Francis Medical Center v. Alliance Environmental Group, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ernest M Robles |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-01219 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Alliance Environmental Group, LLC
990 West Tenth Street
Azuza, CA 91702 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 02/01 10:45 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1219 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Continuing Status Conference From November 3, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/30/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Alliance Environmental Group, LLC. (Catherwood, Kathryn) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Saturday, September 19, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Proof of service (Amended) of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Amended Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Thu 09/10 4:24 PM
Hearing Set Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Alliance Environmental Group, LLC Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Status hearing to be held on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 2:20-ap-01219. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against Alliance Environmental Group, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01219-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |