Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01220
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:May 08, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
227 Washington Street
Conshohocken, PA 19428
Represented By
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 08, 2023
58 58 court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/08 12:51 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1220 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (LG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
57 57 notice Notice Mon 05/08 8:25 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
56 56 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 05/05 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 55 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
55 55 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 05/03 4:47 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From May 9, 2023 At 10:00 A.M. To July 11, 2023 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/3/2023 (LG)
Related: [-] doc