Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01221
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Sep 25, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
AMN Workforce Solutions, LLC
302 Knights Run Avenue #1025
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
AMN Workforce Solutions, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, September 25, 2020
4 4 court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/25 10:09 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1221 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
3 3 notice Notice Tue 09/08 3:43 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)] Filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 2:12 PM
Summons Issued on AMN Workforce Solutions, LLC Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 9:21 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01221. Complaint by Seton Medical Center against AMN Workforce Solutions, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01221-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1