Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01224
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Nov 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ascend Clinical, LLC
1400 Industrial Way
Redwood City, CA 94063
Represented By
Ascend Clinical, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 02, 2020
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/02 4:12 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1224 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Sunday, November 01, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/01 8:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 30, 2020
9 9 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 10/30 1:50 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From November 3, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/30/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
8 8 notice Notice Fri 10/30 12:34 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
7 7 notice Notice Thu 10/15 9:40 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 09/25 6:09 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Saturday, September 19, 2020
5 5 misc Proof of service Sat 09/19 4:31 AM
Proof of service (Amended) of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Amended Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Monday, September 14, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:20 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 9:22 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 2:16 PM
Summons Issued on Ascend Clinical, LLC Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 9:28 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01224. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Ascend Clinical, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01224-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1