Verity Health System of California, Inc. v. Gray
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ernest M Robles |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-01233 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Bryan Lee Gray
3854 Bishop Hill Road
Marcellus, NY 13108 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Verity Health System of California, Inc.
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/01 5:27 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1233 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From November 3, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Answer Complaint No Later Than November 30, 2020 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/2/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Fri 09/25 6:17 PM
Hearing Set Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Saturday, September 19, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Proof of service (Amended) of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Amended Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Bryan Lee Gray Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Status hearing to be held on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 2:20-ap-01233. Complaint by Verity Health System of California, Inc. against Bryan Lee Gray. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01233-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |