Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01241
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Chem-Aqua, Inc.
2727 Chemsearch Boulevard
Irving, TX 75062
Represented By
Chem-Aqua, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 06, 2021
16 16 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/06 8:48 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1241 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
15 15 notice Notice Tue 04/20 6:50 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
14 14 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 11:38 AM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 01/21 9:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 01/19 11:26 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To May 4, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/19/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, January 08, 2021
11 11 notice Notice Fri 01/08 10:19 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 01, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/01 8:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, October 29, 2020
9 9 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 10/29 6:32 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From November 3, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/29/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
8 8 notice Notice Tue 10/27 10:47 AM
Notice of Settlement (AMENDED). Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital. filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
7 7 notice Notice Tue 10/20 6:48 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 09/25 6:26 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Saturday, September 19, 2020
5 5 misc Proof of service Sat 09/19 4:51 AM
Proof of service (Amended) of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Amended Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Monday, September 14, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:34 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 9:41 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 2:38 PM
Summons Issued on Chem-Aqua, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 10:18 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01241. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital against Chem-Aqua, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01241-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1